Wright et al v. Farmers Insurance et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Christopher Wright and Sarah Wright
Defendant: Farmers Insurance, Kaleb Schlottman, David Schlottman and Kory Pearce
Case Number: 3:2021cv05594
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge J Richard Creatura re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Stephen Christopher Wright, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Sarah Wright. Noted for 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment)(ZMG - cc: Plaintiffs by mail)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OR AMEND COMPLAINT re #1 Proposed Complaint, signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. The clerk shall renote Plaintiffs' IFP Applications (Dkts #1 , #2 ) for September 30, 2021. Plaintiffs shall submit a proposed amended complaint or otherwise comply with this Order on or before September 30, 2021. (KMC - cc: Plaintiffs each individually by mail)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER mailed to individual Plaintiffs regarding case number and Judge assignment. (KMC)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis referred to Judge Creatura, filed by Sarah Wright. (KMC)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis referred to Judge Creatura, filed by Stephen Christopher Wright. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Exhibits)(KMC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright et al v. Farmers Insurance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Christopher Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaleb Schlottman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Schlottman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kory Pearce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?