Farrelli's Management Services LLC v. Magnuson et al
Plaintiff: Farrelli's Management Services, LLC and Farrelli's Management Services LLC
Defendant: Leif Magnuson, TipHaus, Inc. doing business as TipHaus NW Inc., Gratuity LLC, Gratuity Solutions LLC and TipHaus Inc doing business as TipHaus NW Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv05621
Filed: August 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Stipulated Motion Extending Time until October 24, 2021 for Defendants Gratuity LLC and Gratuity Solutions LLC to Respond to Complaint, signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time for Defendants Gratuity LLC and Gratuity Solutions LLC to Respond to Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Farrelli's Management Services LLC. Noting Date 9/24/2021, (Tarleton, E)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Adam Joshua Woodward for defendants Gratuity LLC and Gratuity Solutions LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(STP)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Adam Joshua Woodward FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Gratuity LLC, Gratuity Solutions LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7259700 (Possinger, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey Keith Possinger on behalf of Defendants Gratuity LLC, Gratuity Solutions LLC. (Possinger, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in Circuit Court for the 20th Judicial Circuit in and for Collier County Florida, United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida Fort Myers Division, case number(s) in other court 11-2020-CA-003723-0001-XX, 2:21-cv-00604-SPC-MRM ; filed by Plaintiff Farrelli's Management Services LLC. (Shewmake, Thomas)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Farrelli's Management Services LLC (Tarleton, E)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/15/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/22/2021, by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Gratuity LLC, Gratuity Solutions LLC, Leif Magnuson, and TipHaus Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(SP)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (SP)
August 30, 2021 Joint Status Report Deadline NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 11/29/2021. (GMR)
August 30, 2021 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (SP)
August 30, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Farrelli's Management Services LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/7/2021. (SP)
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7225660) Attorney E Russell Tarleton added to party Farrelli's Management Services, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Farrelli's Management Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #7 Summons Magnuson, #8 Summons TipHaus, #9 Summons Gratuity, #10 Summons Gratuity Solutions)(Tarleton, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farrelli's Management Services LLC v. Magnuson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farrelli's Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Shewmake
Represented By: E Russell Tarleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farrelli's Management Services LLC
Represented By: Thomas Shewmake
Represented By: E Russell Tarleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leif Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TipHaus, Inc. doing business as TipHaus NW Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gratuity LLC
Represented By: Adam Joshua Woodward
Represented By: Jeffrey Keith Possinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gratuity Solutions LLC
Represented By: Adam Joshua Woodward
Represented By: Jeffrey Keith Possinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TipHaus Inc doing business as TipHaus NW Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?