Caldwell v. Pacific Dynasty Inc
Plaintiff: Nicole A. Caldwell and Nicole A Caldwell
Defendant: Pacific Dynasty, Inc. and Pacific Dynasty Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv05644
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Pacific Dynasty Inc.(McVittie, Eric)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Pacific Dynasty, Inc. on 9/14/2021, filed by Plaintiff Nicole A Caldwell. (Davies, Richard)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Nicole A Caldwell (Davies, Richard)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 12/13/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/29/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/6/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR WRONGFUL DEATH against defendant(s) Pacific Dynasty Inc with JURY DEMAND, filed by Nicole A Caldwell.(Davies, Richard)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Jury Demand Improperly Indicated.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (KMC)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Pacific Dynasty Inc. (KMC)
September 7, 2021 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (KMC)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR WRONGFUL DEATH against defendant(s) Pacific Dynasty, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7235542), filed by Nicole A. Caldwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Davies, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. Pacific Dynasty Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole A. Caldwell
Represented By: Marissa A. Olsson
Represented By: Richard J Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole A Caldwell
Represented By: Marissa A. Olsson
Represented By: Richard J Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Dynasty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Dynasty Inc
Represented By: Eric R McVittie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?