Davidson v. Burch
Petitioner: Matthew Chester Davidson
Respondent: Christian Burch
Case Number: 3:2021cv05684
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2021 Filing 17 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from the District of Arizona - Tucson and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SP)
September 17, 2021 Filing 16 Case transferred in from the District of Arizona, Case Number 4:19-cv-00003. Documents 1-3, 5-15 received electronically; document 11 is text only docket entry.
September 17, 2021 Judge Benjamin H. Settle and Judge J Richard Creatura added. (SP)
September 15, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed 9/15/21, judgment granting Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 USC 2241 is entered. The 3/17/05 criminal judgment entered by the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington in United States v. Davidson, Case No. 3:03-CR-05828-BHS-1, Doc. 187 (WD Washington) is vacated. This matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington for resentencing in United States v. Davidson, Case No. 3:03-CR-05828-BHS-1 (WD Washington).(BAC) [Transferred from azd on 9/17/2021.]
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED pursuant to the #10 Ninth Circuit's Order, and in accordance with the parties' #13 Notice of Submitting (Joint) Proposed Order, Petitioner Matthew Chester Davidson's #1 Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 USC 2241 is granted. The 3/17/05 criminal judgment entered by the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington in United States v. Davidson, Case No. 3:03-CR-05828-BHS-1, Doc. 187 (WD Washington) is vacated; and this matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington for resentencing in United States v. Davidson, Case No. 3:03-CR-05828-BHS-1 (WD Washington). The Clerk of Court must promptly transmit a copy of this Order to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington for filing in United States v. Davidson, Case No. 3:03-CR-05828-BHS-1 (WD Washington). The Clerk of Court must enter Judgment in this case granting a writ of habeas corpus and terminate this action. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 9/14/21.(BAC) [Transferred from azd on 9/17/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE re: Submitting Joint Proposed Order and Judgment by Christian Burch re: #12 Order . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order and Judgment)(Faulk, Denise) [Transferred from azd on 9/17/2021.]
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED The Clerk of Court must vacate entry of Judgment and reopen this case. Clerk must add the following as counsel for Respondent to this Court's docket: Denise Ann Faulk, Arizona Assistant US Attorney, Teal Luthy Miller, Assistant US Attorney, Michael Symington Morgan, Assistant US Attorney. No later than 30 days from the filing date of this Order, parties must submit either a joint proposed form of order and judgment in this case; or file separate briefs in support of the parties respective proposed forms of order and judgment in this case. Clerk must mail, and transmit by email, a copy of this Order to Petitioner's and Respondent's counsel. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 7/21/21.(BAC) [Transferred from azd on 9/17/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: This case is reassigned to the Honorable James A. Soto. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: CV-19-3-TUC-JAS(LAB). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BJWI) [Transferred from azd on 9/17/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 10 MANDATE of USCA re: #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Matthew Chester Davidson. REVERSED and REMANDED. (Attachments: #1 Order)(KAH) [Transferred from azd on 9/17/2021.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER of USCA re: #7 Notice of Appeal filed by Matthew Chester Davidson. To the extent required, a certificate of appealability is granted with respect to whether the petition filed by appellant in the district court is a legitimate 28 USC 2241 petition brought pursuant to the escape hatch of 28 USC 2255 and, if so, whether appellant is entitled to relief. There was no appearance by the appellee in district court. Clerk will serve a copy of this order on respondent's counsel, Christina M Cabanillas, Deputy Appellate Chief, United States Attorney's Office. (See attached PDF for complete information). (BAC) [Transferred from azd on 9/17/2021.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 USCA Case Number re: #7 Notice of Appeal. Case number 19-15099, 9th CCA. (KAH) [Transferred from azd on 9/17/2021.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #6 Clerks Judgment, #5 Order by Matthew Chester Davidson. (Hilzendeger, Keith) [Transferred from azd on 9/17/2021.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 VACATED by Doc. #12 . CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed 1/16/19, the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is Dismissed. Petitioner to take nothing. This action is closed.(BAC) Modified on 7/22/2021 (BAC). [Transferred from azd on 9/17/2021.]
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #1 Petition for the Writ of Habeas Corpus is DISMISSED. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment and close this civil action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no Certificate of Appealability shall issue. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 1/16/19.(BAC) [Transferred from azd on 9/17/2021.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (ARC) [Transferred from azd on 9/17/2021.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith James Hilzendeger on behalf of Matthew Chester Davidson. (ARC) [Transferred from azd on 9/17/2021.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Fed/2241). Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number 0970-16363683 filed by Matthew Chester Davidson. (Hilzendeger, Keith) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC) [Transferred from azd on 9/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson v. Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matthew Chester Davidson
Represented By: Keith James Hilzendeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christian Burch
Represented By: Denise Ann Faulk
Represented By: Michael Symington Morgan
Represented By: Teal Luthy Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?