Daisy v. Haynes et al
Plaintiff: Jordan Daisy
Defendant: Ronald Haynes, Sara Kariko, Ryan Herrington and Ron Attard
Case Number: 3:2021cv05709
Filed: September 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S #6 REQUEST TO DISMISS signed by Judge David W. Christel. On or before 12/10/2021, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint consistent with the Order Declining Service and Granting Leave to Amend (Dkt. #3 ) or advise the Court that he does, in fact, wish to dismiss this action. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jordan Daisy, Prisoner ID: 354931)(AMD)
November 10, 2021 Amended Complaint deadline 12/10/2021. **DO NOT PRINT**(Jordan Daisy, Prisoner ID: 354931)(AMD)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw #5 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Jordan Daisy. Noting Date 11/26/2021. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jordan Daisy, Prisoner ID: 354931)(AMD)
November 1, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Ron Attard, Ronald Haynes, Ryan Herrington, Sara Kariko with JURY DEMAND, filed by Jordan Daisy.**7 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jordan Daisy, Prisoner ID: 354931) (AMD)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Judge David W. Christel. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jordan Daisy, Prisoner ID: 354931) (AMD)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DECLINING SERVICE AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge David W. Christel. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to adequately respond to the issues raised herein on or before 12/1/2021, the undersigned will recommend dismissal of this action. (Attachments: #1 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Form)**18 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jordan Daisy, Prisoner ID: 354931)(AMD)
November 1, 2021 Amended Complaint due 12/1/2021, re #3 Order. **DO NOT PRINT**(Jordan Daisy, Prisoner ID: 354931)(AMD)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jordan Daisy, Prisoner ID: 354931) (AMD)
September 23, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Jordan Daisy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint) **11 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jordan Daisy, Prisoner ID: 354931) (AMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daisy v. Haynes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Daisy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Kariko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Attard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?