White Eagle v. Washington State Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Naomi Sue White Eagle and Lowell G Lowe
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections, Stephen Sinclair, Cheryl Strange, John or Jane Doe, Diedra L Clay, Cryder, Furst, John Does and Jane Does
Case Number: 3:2021cv05716
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge J Richard Creatura, re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Naomi Sue White Eagle. The parties shall have fourteen (14) days from service of this Report to file written objections and this matter is set for consideration on 12/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Naomi White Eagle, Prisoner ID: 855988)(AMD)
November 10, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Facts in Support of Motion filed by Plaintiff Naomi Sue White Eagle, re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order **7 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Naomi White Eagle, Prisoner ID: 855988) (AMD)
November 10, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Collin Turner filed by Plaintiff Naomi Sue White Eagle, re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Naomi White Eagle, Prisoner ID: 855988)(AMD)
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION in Support of Motion filed by Plaintiff Naomi Sue White Eagle, re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Naomi White Eagle, Prisoner ID: 855988)(AMD)
November 10, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff Naomi Sue White Eagle. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/10/2021. **16 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Naomi White Eagle, Prisoner ID: 855988)(AMD)
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Naomi Sue White Eagle (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration in Support of Motion, #3 Memo in Support of Motion, #4 Declaration of Facts, #5 Statement of Concerned Facts)**17 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Naomi White Eagle, Prisoner ID: 855988) (AMD)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION signed by Judge J Richard Creatura, re #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's amended proposed complaint is due on or before 1/3/2022. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Naomi White Eagle, Prisoner ID: 855988) (AMD)
November 2, 2021 Proposed Amended Complaint deadline 1/3/2022, re #8 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. ***Motion terminated: Response to Show Cause re #5 Order to Show Cause; Extension of time granted to 1/3/2022. **DO NOT PRINT**(Naomi White Eagle, Prisoner ID: 855988) (AMD)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED Motion for Medical and Mental Health Reports and Recommendation Files, filed by Plaintiff Naomi Sue White Eagle. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Naomi White Eagle, Prisoner ID: 855988)(SP)
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Naomi Sue White Eagle. Noted by clerk for: 11/2/2021 11/12/2021. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Naomi White Eagle, Prisoner ID: 855988)(SP) Modified noting date on 11/2/2021 per #8 Order (AMD).
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OR AMEND THE #1 -1 PROPOSED COMPLAINT; signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. If plaintiff fails to file an amended proposed complaint or fails to adequately address the issues raised on or before November 12, 2021, the undersigned will recommend dismissal of this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Clerk is directed to renote the #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis for November 12, 2021. (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint Form (blank))**17 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Naomi White Eagle, Prisoner ID: 855988)(SP)
October 15, 2021 Response to Show Cause #5 Order due by 11/12/2021. **DO NOT PRINT**(Naomi White Eagle, Prisoner ID: 855988)(SP)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Naomi Sue White Eagle.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Naomi White Eagle, Prisoner ID: 855988)(AMD)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Application. ***Action Required*** Incorrect IFP Form.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 10/28/2021 to correct IFP application (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Naomi White Eagle, Prisoner ID: 855988)(AMD)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Naomi Sue White Eagle. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Proposed Motion for Injunction Relief, #3 Proposed Motion to Appoint Counsel, #4 Note for Motion)**175 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Naomi White Eagle, Prisoner ID: 855988)(AMD) Modified on 9/30/2021 to label motions as "proposed" (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White Eagle v. Washington State Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Sue White Eagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lowell G Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diedra L Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cryder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?