Peoples Bank v. Laura Lou et al
Plaintiff: Peoples Bank
Defendant: LAURA LOU and Lonn I Ostrem
Case Number: 3:2021cv05720
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 954
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office re: Warrant for Arrest on 10/25/2021: 1 DUSM/6 hours - $390.00/82 miles round trip - $45.92/Total = $435.92. (SP)
November 3, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office re: Substitute Custodian on 10/25/2021: For Marine Lenders Service. (SP)
November 2, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Publication filed by Plaintiff Peoples Bank (Cammock, Craig)
October 26, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Peoples Bank (Cammock, Craig)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 1/3/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/20/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/27/2021. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AUTHORIZING CLERK TO ISSUE A WARRANT FOR ARREST PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL RULE C re #6 Motion for Arrest of Vessel; signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (copies delivered to USMO)(SP)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER APPOINTING MARINE LENDERS SERVICES, LLC SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN AND AUTHORIZING MOVEMENT OF VESSEL re #2 Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian; signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (SP)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Lonn I Ostrem. (SP)
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Peoples Bank (Cammock, Craig)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Arrest of Vessel , filed by Plaintiff Peoples Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Warrant for Arrest) Noting Date 10/1/2021, (Cammock, Craig)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Peoples Bank re #2 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian (Cammock, Craig)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Ivan Dochovski filed by Plaintiff Peoples Bank re #2 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian (Cammock, Craig)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Buck Fowler, Jr. filed by Plaintiff Peoples Bank re #2 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian (Cammock, Craig)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian, filed by Plaintiff Peoples Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/1/2021, (Cammock, Craig)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-7269668), filed by Peoples Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cammock, Craig)
September 28, 2021 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peoples Bank v. Laura Lou et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peoples Bank
Represented By: Craig E Cammock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA LOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonn I Ostrem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?