Penwell v Strange et al
Plaintiff: Tony Penwell
Defendant: Cheryl Strange, Eric Jackson and Melida Ferrel
Case Number: 3:2021cv05722
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
2 Judge: Michelle L Peterson
3 Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Cheryl Strange mailed on 10/27/2021 **PRINT ALL**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(Williams, Aaron)
November 24, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Eric Jackson mailed on 10/27/2021 **PRINT ALL**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(Williams, Aaron)
November 24, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Melida Ferrel mailed on 10/27/2021 **PRINT ALL**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(Williams, Aaron)
November 24, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Aaron Michael Williams on behalf of Defendants Melida Ferrel, Eric Jackson, Cheryl Strange. **PRINT ALL**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(Williams, Aaron)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTFF'S #14 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Objections to the pending Reportand Recommendation, if any, must be filed by 12/6/2021.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(AMD)
November 15, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time re #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, filed by Plaintiff Tony Penwell. Noting Date 12/3/2021. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(AMD)
October 27, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge J Richard Creatura re Plaintiff's #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Noting Date: 11/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)**13 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(SP)
October 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF OPTION TO CONSENT TO US MAGISTRATE JUDGE. To consent to a US Magistrate Judge, return the executed form by 11/26/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(SP)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by E-Mail to the named defendants (3); signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. ( #7 Complaint, this Order, notice of lawsuit and waiver of service, notice of option to consent, and #10 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction emailed on 10/27/21) (Attachments: #1 Pro se Instruction Sheet)**6 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(SP)
October 27, 2021 Check status of service waivers per #11 Order Directing Service, due by 12/3/2021. **DO NOT PRINT**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(SP)
October 25, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff Tony Penwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-13) Noting Date 11/12/2021, **92 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(ZMG)
October 25, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Certify Class, filed by Plaintiff Tony Penwell. Noting Date 11/12/2021, **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(ZMG)
October 25, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Tony Penwell. Noting Date 11/12/2021, **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(ZMG)
October 25, 2021 Filing 7 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Melida Ferrel, Eric Jackson, Cheryl Strange with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # IFP granted), filed by Tony Penwell.**14 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(ZMG)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) by Judge J Richard Creatura. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Instruction Sheet, #2 IFP Authorization)**7 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(ZMG cc: Inmate Account Mgr) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/5/2021) (ZMG).
October 25, 2021 Noting Date Reset re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Renoted for: 10/25/2021 per LCR 7(d)(1). **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(SP)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Robert J. Bryan and referred to Judge J. Richard Creatura for all further proceedings as it is related to CV21-1004RBJ-JRC and CV21-1070RJB-JRC. Judge Benjamin H. Settle and Hon. Michelle L. Peterson no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745) (MGC)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff Tony Penwell (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibits 1-13)**99 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(ST)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(ST)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Peterson, filed by Tony Penwell. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 PROPOSED Motion to Appoint Counsel, #3 PROPOSED Motion for Certification of Class, #4 Prison Trust Account Statement)**26 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Tony Penwell, Prisoner ID: 274745)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penwell v Strange et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Penwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Strange
Represented By: Aaron Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Jackson
Represented By: Aaron Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melida Ferrel
Represented By: Aaron Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?