Smith v. Cordero et al
Plaintiff: Blair Smith
Defendant: Ryan Cordero, Sea Mar Community Health Centers, United State of America and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2021cv05747
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Referring Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court recommends Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, Dkt. #7 , should be GRANTED and this matter should be DISMISSED with prejudice. Objections to the Report and Recommendation, if any, should be filed with fourteen (14) days of the date on which this Report and Recommendation is signed. This matter is noted for 12/17/2021. Signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment) (SR)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Parties' #16 Stipulated MOTION to Stay Discovery. Signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (SR)
November 18, 2021 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION to Stay Discovery, filed by Defendant United States of America. Noting Date 11/18/2021, (Passmore, Whitney)
November 12, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY, filed by Defendant United States of America, TO RESPONSE to #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Passmore, Whitney)
November 9, 2021 Filing 14 REDACTION to #12 Response to Motion, 12-1 Tiller Declaration by Plaintiff Blair Smith (Park, Cynthia)
November 9, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #12 Response to Motion. ***Action Required*** Redaction.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (AMD)
November 8, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Blair Smith, to #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 SEALED Exhibit Declaration of Liandra Tiller and Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion)(Park, Cynthia) Modified on 11/9/2021 (AMD).
October 18, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Revised) (Passmore, Whitney)
October 18, 2021 Attorney Cynthia Park for Blair Smith added; per #10 Notice of Attorney Association. (AMD)
October 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Andrew Kim on behalf of Plaintiff Blair Smith. (Kim, Andrew)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/4/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/18/2021, Joint Status Report due by 11/26/2021. (KMP)
October 14, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle and referred to Hon. S. Kate Vaughan pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and Amended General Order 02-19. (KMP)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant United State of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/12/2021, (Passmore, Whitney)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/15/2021. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Thurston County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (AMD)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Substitution Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2679(d)(1) ; filed by Defendants Ryan Cordero, Sea Mar Community Health Centers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Passmore, Whitney)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Ryan Cordero, Sea Mar Community Health Centers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings)(Passmore, Whitney)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Robert Murphy re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Ryan Cordero, Sea Mar Community Health Centers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Passmore, Whitney)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County Superior Court, case number 21-2-01254-34; () Attorney Whitney Passmore added to party Ryan Cordero(pty:dft), Attorney Whitney Passmore added to party Sea Mar Community Health Centers(pty:dft), filed by Sea Mar Community Health Centers, Ryan Cordero. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Passmore, Whitney) (No Fee Required)
October 8, 2021 Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (AMD)
October 8, 2021 Party United State of America added. Party Ryan Cordero and Sea Mar Community Health Centers terminated. (Refer to #4 Notice of Substitution) (AMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Cordero et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blair Smith
Represented By: Andrew Kim
Represented By: Cynthia Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Cordero
Represented By: Whitney Passmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sea Mar Community Health Centers
Represented By: Whitney Passmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United State of America
Represented By: Whitney Passmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Whitney Passmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?