Ellis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Joseph-Harvey Ellis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv05771
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Fricke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lars Joseph Nelson on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Nelson, Lars)
October 22, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Joseph-Harvey Ellis re #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued (Electronic service by email per General Orders 04-15 and 05-15) (Linerud, Rory)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, by Judge Theresa L Fricke: Jury Trial is set for 5/18/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Theresa L Fricke. Joinder of Parties and Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/19/2021, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 12/17/2021, Motions related to discovery noted by 1/7/2022, Discovery completed by 1/14/2022, Dispositive motions due by 2/18/2022, Motions in Limine due by 3/11/2022, Pretrial Order due by 4/29/2022, Trial briefs, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions, and trial exhibits due by 5/6/2022. ENTERED IN ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD (DK) Modified on 10/20/2021 (DK).
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DK)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Joseph-Harvey Ellis.(DK)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke, re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (DK)
October 20, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #7 Scheduling Order: Document entered in wrong case. Please disregard. (DK)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT by Plaintiff to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (GMR)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Joseph-Harvey Ellis.(Linerud, Rory)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 PROPOSED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Joseph-Harvey Ellis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Office of General Counsel, #3 Summons US Attorney)(Linerud, Rory) (IFP Fee Pending) Modified on 10/19/2021 to reflect proposed (MET).
October 19, 2021 Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (ZMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph-Harvey Ellis
Represented By: Rory J Linerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Represented By: Lars Joseph Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?