Flood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mheri J Flood
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv05779
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Liva Jamala Edwards on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Edwards, Liva)
October 26, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on USAO-WDWA on 10/26/2021, filed by Plaintiff Mheri J Flood. (Oliver, David)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2, #2 Summons 3)(SB)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Summons(es) to be issued) (Receipt # IFP Granted) filed by Mheri J Flood. (SB)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be issued summonses. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB) (cc: finance)
October 22, 2021 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (ZMG)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Mheri J Flood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Oliver, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mheri J Flood
Represented By: David P Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe
Represented By: Liva Jamala Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?