Columbia Riverkeeper v. Mercury Plastics Inc
Plaintiff: Columbia Riverkeeper
Defendant: Mercury Plastics, Inc. and Mercury Plastics Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv05784
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David G Estudillo
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent New Mercury Plastics, LLC for Mercury Plastics Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mercury Plastics Inc (Hill, Steven)
November 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven F Hill on behalf of Defendant Mercury Plastics Inc. (Hill, Steven)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/24/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/31/2022. Signed by Hon. David G. Estudillo. (MGC)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Mercury Plastics Inc, filed by Columbia Riverkeeper.(Tonry, Claire)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Mercury Plastics Inc. (AMD)
October 25, 2021 Hon. David G. Estudillo added. (AMD)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Columbia Riverkeeper (Tonry, Claire)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Mercury Plastics, Inc. (Receipt # AWAWDC-7303004), filed by Columbia Riverkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Tonry, Claire)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia Riverkeeper v. Mercury Plastics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Riverkeeper
Represented By: Claire Tonry
Represented By: Simone Anter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercury Plastics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercury Plastics Inc
Represented By: Steven F Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?