In re the complaint of Pacific Northwest Marine Company for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability as Owner of the M/V Knot at Work
Petitioner: Pacific Northwest Marine Company a WA Corporation doing business as Freedom Boat Club Tacoma (dba) and Pacific Northwest Marine Company a WA Corporation doing business as Freedom Boat Club Tacoma other M/V Knot at Work
Case Number: 3:2021cv05824
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 183
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 16 PRAECIPE Clerk's Amended Citation to Marshal to Issue Notice of Exoneration or Limitation Proceedings by Petitioner Pacific Northwest Marine Company (Browne, Joseph)
January 7, 2022 Filing 15 REQUEST Monition by Petitioner Pacific Northwest Marine Company for Monition (Browne, Joseph)
January 7, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Issuance of Amended Monition and Clerk's Citation , filed by Petitioner Pacific Northwest Marine Company. Noting Date 1/7/2022, (Browne, Joseph)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Tana Lin for all further proceedings. Authorized by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (GC)
November 23, 2021 Filing 12 WRIT of Monition, Electronically Issued. (Writ of Monition, #10 Order, #11 Order, #1 Complaint, #4 Declaration, and #5 Notice hand delivered to USMS) (AMD) (Main Document 12 replaced on 11/23/2021) (AMD).
November 18, 2021 RECEIPT re #11 Order on Motion for Order,. $500.00 deposited into the Court Registry on 11/18/2021 (Receipt # TAC016838) (SMG)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION RE: SECURITY FOR COSTS signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle, re #8 Motion for Order. Petitioner shall deposit with the Court security for costs in the amount of $500 and additional security in the amount of six percent (6%) per annum to be paid into the Court on or before the one-year anniversary of the date of this notice, and on or before each one-year anniversary thereafter until judgment is entered or the case is dismissed. (AMD - cc: fin)
November 17, 2021 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #10 Order on Motion for Order : Corrected the link to doc #3 (doc #8 was incorrect motion). (AMD)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING SECURITY SUBMITTED FOR LIMITATION FUND AND COSTS, DIRECTING MONITION AND ISSUING INJUNCTION signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle, re #3 #8 Motion for Order. (AMD) Modified/corrected doc link on 11/17/2021 (AMD)(cc: fin)
November 10, 2021 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (ZMG)
November 9, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pacific Northwest Marine Company (Browne, Joseph)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Order Re: Security for Costs, filed by Petitioner Pacific Northwest Marine Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/9/2021, (Browne, Joseph)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 PRAECIPE by Petitioner Pacific Northwest Marine Company (Attachments: #1 Citation)(Browne, Joseph)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST Monition by Petitioner Pacific Northwest Marine Company for Monition (Browne, Joseph)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Value ; filed by Petitioner Pacific Northwest Marine Company. (Browne, Joseph)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Counsel filed by Petitioner Pacific Northwest Marine Company re #3 MOTION for Order Approving Security for Limitation and Costs, Directing Monition and Issuing Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1, #2 Exhibit Exh. 2)(Browne, Joseph)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Order Approving Security for Limitation and Costs, Directing Monition and Issuing Injunction , filed by Petitioner Pacific Northwest Marine Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/9/2021, (Browne, Joseph)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Petitioner Pacific Northwest Marine Company. (Browne, Joseph) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/9/2021) (KB).
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability against defendant(s) Pacific Northwest Marine Company (Receipt # AWAWDC-7327723), filed by Pacific Northwest Marine Company.(Browne, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re the complaint of Pacific Northwest Marine Company for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability as Owner of the M/V Knot at Work
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pacific Northwest Marine Company a WA Corporation doing business as Freedom Boat Club Tacoma (dba)
Represented By: Joseph M Browne
Represented By: William Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pacific Northwest Marine Company a WA Corporation doing business as Freedom Boat Club Tacoma other M/V Knot at Work
Represented By: Joseph M Browne
Represented By: William Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?