Bang v. Lacamas Shores Homeowners Association
Plaintiff: Steven D Bang
Defendant: Lacamas Shores Homeowners Association
Case Number: 3:2021cv05834
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/21/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/7/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/14/2022. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
December 9, 2021 Filing 6 PRAECIPE to attach document corrected signature page re #5 Answer to Complaint by Defendant Lacamas Shores Homeowners Association (Tingey, Christopher)
December 8, 2021 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #5 Answer to Complaint was improperly signed by Christopher M. Tingey. As such, the attorney was not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (LH) (cc: Attorney Tingey via ECF ad hoc)
December 7, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney David Max Phillips added to party Lacamas Shores Homeowners Association(pty:dft) by Lacamas Shores Homeowners Association.(Phillips, David)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Lacamas Shores Homeowners Association on 11/16/2021, filed by Plaintiff Steven D Bang. (Plauche, Samuel)
November 15, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Lacamas Shores Homeowners Association. (AMD)
November 15, 2021 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (AMD)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs (Receipt # AWAWDC-7330663) Attorney Samuel Wilmore Plauche, IV added to party Steven D Bang(pty:pla), filed by Steven D Bang. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Plauche, Samuel) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/12/2021 to flatten malformed PDF) (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bang v. Lacamas Shores Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven D Bang
Represented By: Jesse G DeNike
Represented By: Samuel Wilmore Plauche, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacamas Shores Homeowners Association
Represented By: David Max Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?