Hunt v. Medtronic USA Inc
Plaintiff: William Hunt and William Hunt, Jr
Defendant: Medtronic USA Inc. and Medtronic USA Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv05854
Filed: November 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff William Hunt, Jr, to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Freeman, Spencer)
January 17, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiff William Hunt, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/4/2022, (Freeman, Spencer)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED MOTION AND ORDER RENOTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle, re #14 Stipulated MOTION. #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM is renoted to 1/21/2022. (AMD)
January 3, 2022 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION to Renote Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff William Hunt, Jr. Noting Date 1/3/2022, (Freeman, Spencer)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Victoria Davis Lockard for Defendant Medtronic USA Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Katherine "Kate" Wittlake for Defendant Medtronic USA Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
December 13, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Medtronic USA Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/7/2022, (Fogg, Steven)
December 13, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Katherine Michelle Wittlake FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Medtronic USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7368900 (Fogg, Steven)
December 13, 2021 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Victoria Davis Lockard FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Medtronic USA Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7368881 (Fogg, Steven)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED MOTION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS DEADLINE TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE PLEAD signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle, re #7 Stipulated MOTION. Defendant Medtronic USA, Inc.'s deadline to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs complaint is extended to 12/13/2021. (AMD)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Defendant's Deadline to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead, filed by Defendant Medtronic USA Inc. Noting Date 11/29/2021, (Sheridan, Kelly)
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kelly H Sheridan on behalf of Defendant Medtronic USA Inc. (Sheridan, Kelly)
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (ZMG)
November 24, 2021 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - NOT submitted properly or NOT on file (Please refer to #LCR 101(b)(3) to file a proper jury demand) (ZMG)
November 24, 2021 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (ZMG)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Medtronic USA Inc.. (Sheridan, Kelly)
November 22, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Medtronic plc for Medtronic USA Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Medtronic USA Inc. (Sheridan, Kelly)
November 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 21-2-08002-4; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7343440) Attorney Kelly H Sheridan added to party Medtronic USA Inc.(pty:dft), filed by Medtronic USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1State Court Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Sheridan, Kelly) Modified on 11/24/2021 (ZMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Medtronic USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hunt, Jr
Represented By: Spencer D Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic USA Inc.
Represented By: Kelly H Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic USA Inc
Represented By: Kate Wittlake
Represented By: Kelly H Sheridan
Represented By: Steven W Fogg
Represented By: Victoria Davis Lockard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?