Tunnel IP LLC v. Cyber Acoustics Inc
Plaintiff: Tunnel IP LLC
Defendant: Cyber Acoustics Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv05937
Filed: December 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2022 Filing 21 FINAL REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (AMD)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS by signed Judge Benjamin H. Settle. All claims against Defendant are dismissed with prejudice and all counterclaims against Plaintiff are dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs.(AMD)
February 4, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Tunnel IP LLC, Tunnel IP LLC, Cyber Acoustics Inc and Cyber Acoustics Inc, filed by Counter Defendant Tunnel IP LLC, Plaintiff Tunnel IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mann, Philip)
January 26, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Cyber Acoustics Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss) Noting Date 2/18/2022, (Yanick, Miles)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael Vincent for Defendant/Counter Claimant Cyber Acoustics Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Neil J McNabnay for Defendant/Counter Claimant Cyber Acoustics Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ricardo Bonilla for Defendant/Counter Claimant Cyber Acoustics Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
January 26, 2022 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael Vincent FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Cyber Acoustics Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7416590 (Yanick, Miles) (Main Document 14 replaced on 1/26/2022 due to missing signatures) (JWC). Modified on 1/26/2022 (JWC).
January 26, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Neil McNabnay FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Cyber Acoustics Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7416584 (Yanick, Miles) (Main Document 13 replaced on 1/26/2022 due to missing signatures) (JWC). Modified on 1/26/2022 (JWC).
January 26, 2022 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ricardo J. Bonilla FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Cyber Acoustics Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7416569 (Yanick, Miles) (Main Document 12 replaced on 1/26/2022 due to missing signatures) (JWC). Modified on 1/26/2022 (JWC).
January 26, 2022 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Speed Tech Corporation, Corporate Parent Speed Net Technology Limited for Cyber Acoustics Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cyber Acoustics Inc (Yanick, Miles)
January 26, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND Attorney Miles A Yanick added to party Cyber Acoustics Inc(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Tunnel IP LLC by Cyber Acoustics Inc.(Yanick, Miles)
January 5, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Tunnel IP LLC (Mann, Philip)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Justin Schiff for Plaintiff Tunnel IP LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Justin Schiff FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Tunnel IP LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7391406 (Mann, Philip)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings. Judge Robert J. Bryan no longer assigned to case. Entered as directed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (TC)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/21/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/28/2022, Joint Status Report due by 4/4/2022. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
January 3, 2022 JSR due 4/4/2022. (JL)
December 30, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (ZMG)
December 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Cyber Acoustics Inc (ZMG)
December 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against defendant(s) Cyber Acoustics, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7387105) Attorney Philip P Mann added to party Tunnel IP LLC(pty:pla), filed by Tunnel IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #5 Summons)(Mann, Philip)
December 30, 2021 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (ZMG)
December 30, 2021 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/6/2022. (ZMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tunnel IP LLC v. Cyber Acoustics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tunnel IP LLC
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Represented By: Justin Schiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyber Acoustics Inc
Represented By: Michael Vincent
Represented By: Miles A Yanick
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Ricardo Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?