United States Fire Insurance Company et al v. Oxbo Inc et al
Plaintiff: United States Fire Insurance Company, Endurance American Insurance Company, Navigators Insurance Company and Agrico Sales Inc
Defendant: Oxbo, Inc. d/b/a Oxbo Mega Transport Solutions, Oxbo Engineering, LLC, Oxbo Inc an Oregon corporation doing business as Oxbo Mega Transport Solutions and Oxbo Engineering LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv05228
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 14 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Oxbo Inc.(Bamberger, Sylvia)
May 20, 2022 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Agrico Sales Inc (Buhler, Michelle)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge John H. Chun. Joint Status Report due by 6/13/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/23/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/6/2022. (AD)
May 6, 2022 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Oxbo, Inc. for Oxbo Engineering LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Oxbo Engineering LLC (Parker, Christopher)
May 6, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher M Parker on behalf of Defendant Oxbo Engineering LLC. (Parker, Christopher)
April 26, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sylvia Karen Bamberger on behalf of Defendant Oxbo Inc. (Bamberger, Sylvia)
April 25, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Oxbo Inc (Bamberger, Sylvia)
April 21, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Oxbo Mega Transport Solutions for Oxbo Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Oxbo Inc (Bamberger, Sylvia)
April 20, 2022 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Navigators Group, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Navigators Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Navigators Insurance Company (Buhler, Michelle)
April 20, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Endurance Assurance Corporation, Corporate Parent Endurance U.S. Holdings Corp, Corporate Parent Endurance Specialty Insurance Ltd. (Bermuda), Corporate Parent Sompo International Holdings Ltd. (Bermuda), Corporate Parent Sompo Japan Insurance Inc. (Japan), Corporate Parent Sompo Holdings, Inc. (Japan) for Endurance American Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Endurance American Insurance Company (Buhler, Michelle)
April 20, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Fairfax (US) Inc., Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Holdings Corp, Corporate Parent FFHL Group Ltd. for United States Fire Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by United States Fire Insurance Company (Buhler, Michelle)
April 13, 2022 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendants Oxbo Engineering LLC, Oxbo Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(AMD)
April 13, 2022 Judge John H. Chun added. (AMD)
April 13, 2022 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiffs must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4/20/2022. (AMD)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Oxbo Engineering, LLC, Oxbo, Inc. d/b/a Oxbo Mega Transport Solutions, filed by United States Fire Insurance Company, Endurance American Insurance Company, Navigators Insurance Company, and Agrico Sales Inc. (Buhler, Michelle) Modified on 4/13/2022to add additional filer (KB).
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Oxbo Engineering, LLC, Oxbo, Inc. d/b/a Oxbo Mega Transport Solutions (Receipt # AWAWDC-7508116) Attorney Michelle Buhler added to party Endurance American Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle Buhler added to party Navigators Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Michelle Buhler added to party United States Fire Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by United States Fire Insurance Company, Endurance American Insurance Company, Navigators Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Buhler, Michelle) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/13/2022 to flatten malformed PDF) (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Fire Insurance Company et al v. Oxbo Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles S Jordan
Represented By: Michelle Buhler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endurance American Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles S Jordan
Represented By: Michelle Buhler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navigators Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles S Jordan
Represented By: Michelle Buhler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agrico Sales Inc
Represented By: Charles S Jordan
Represented By: Michelle Buhler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxbo, Inc. d/b/a Oxbo Mega Transport Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxbo Engineering, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxbo Inc an Oregon corporation doing business as Oxbo Mega Transport Solutions
Represented By: Sylvia Karen Bamberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxbo Engineering LLC
Represented By: Christopher M Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?