Al-Bustani v. Alger et al
Plaintiff: Al-Hareth Al-Albustani and Al-Hareth Al-Bustani
Defendant: Kay Stone, Sean B Alger, Steve Outtrim, Alicia Taylor, S.B. Alger Studio Productions LLC, Evan Watson, Harrison Lindley, Clyde Lewis, Alpha Media LLC, Ashlea Stinnett, Kristie Williams, Invoke, LLC, Dean Reiner, Sloan Bella, Change.org, SB Alger Studio Productions LLC, Invoke LLC, Jane and John Does 1-10, Louis Clyde Holder, James Maiden, Gen Media Partners LLC doing business as G Networks, G Networks LLC and Sun Audio Networks LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv05238
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting Defendant's #97 Motion to Dismiss. Mr. Al-Bustani's claim for vicarious copyright infringement against Defendant Gen Media LLC is DISMISSED with prejudice and without leave to amend. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (cc: Defendant Holder via US mail)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Party G Networks LLC terminated per #103 Order, and per the direction of chambers. (LH)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 PRAECIPE re #101 Reply to Response to #97 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Defendant Gen Media Partners LLC (Attachments: #1 Corrected Reply)(Morrison, James) Modified to add linkage on 4/24/2023 (LH).
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REPLY, filed by Defendant Gen Media Partners LLC, TO RESPONSE to #97 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Morrison, James)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani, to #97 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Oral Argument Requested. (Ford, Susan)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER: The court DENIES Mr. Al-Bustani's motion for extension of time (Dkt. #98 ). Mr. Al-Bustani must file a response to Gen Media's motion to dismiss his second amended complaint by no later than Monday, April 17, 2023. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (cc: Defendant Holder via US mail)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time re #97 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint , filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/11/2023, (Ford, Susan) Modified title on 4/12/2023 (LH).
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Gen Media Partners LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/21/2023, (Morrison, James)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting Defendant's #95 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Gen Media Partners LLC's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint is 3/24/2023. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) Modified on 3/3/2023 - cc: Defendant Holder via US mail (LH).
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #94 Amended Complaint, , filed by Defendant Gen Media Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/2/2023, (Morrison, James)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief and Damages for Copyright Infringement, Vicarious Copyright Infringement; Violation of WA Personality Rights Act; Invasion of Privacy; Intentional Infliction of Emotional Outrage; Negl. Infliction of Emotional Distress against defendant(s) Al-Hareth Al-Bustani with JURY DEMAND, filed by Al-Hareth Al-Bustani.(Ford, Susan)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Amended STATUS REPORT - JOINT STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani (Ford, Susan)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *5 days*. Jury Trial is set for 6/10/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 5/9/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2023, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/13/2023, Motions due by 1/12/2024, Discovery completed by 2/12/2024, Dispositive motions due by 3/12/2024, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 4/11/2024, Motions in Limine due by 4/29/2024, Pretrial Order due by 5/20/2024, Deposition Designations due by 5/20/2024, Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/3/2024, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 6/3/2024. (AD) cc: Defendant Louis Clyde Holder via US mail
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: The court GRANTS in part Gen Media's motion to dismiss (Dkt. #79 ) and DENIES Mr. Al-Bustani's second motion to amend (Dkt. # 84) as moot. Mr. Al-Bustani may file a second amended complaint in conformity with this order no later than 2/17/2023. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (cc: Defendant Holder via US mail)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant James Maiden. (AD)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION for Default against James Maiden,, filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/3/2023, (Ford, Susan)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani, TO RESPONSE to #84 Second MOTION to Amend #44 Amended Complaint,, (Ford, Susan)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 RESPONSE, by Defendant Gen Media Partners LLC, to #84 Second MOTION to Amend #44 Amended Complaint,,. (Morrison, James)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REPLY, filed by Defendant Gen Media Partners LLC, TO RESPONSE to #79 MOTION to Dismiss (Morrison, James)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: The court DISCHARGES its order to show cause (Dkt. #80 ), and DISMISSES Steve Outtrim, Ashlea Stinnett, Evan Watson, and Harrison Lindley without prejudice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (cc: Defendant Holder via US mail)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Second MOTION to Amend #44 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/27/2023, (Ford, Susan)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani, to #79 MOTION to Dismiss . (Ford, Susan)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani re: #80 Order to Show Cause, (Ford, Susan)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on James Maiden on 11/3/2022, filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani. (Ford, Susan)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE by no later than 1/9/2023, why Defendants Steven Outtrim, Ashlea Stinnett, James Maiden, Evan Watson, and Harrison Lindley should not be dismissed from this action for failure to comply with Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant Gen Media Partners LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/13/2023, (Morrison, James)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #78 Reply. Revised entry to indicate this is a reply to a Minute Order. (LH)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 REPLY, filed by Defendant Sloan Bella, to #77 Minute Order. RESPONSE to #64 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #44 Amended Complaint, (Bella, Sloan) Modified title on 12/16/2022 (LH)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MINUTE ORDER: The court DIRECTS pro se Defendants Bella Sloan and Louis Clyde Holder to file any objections or proposed modifications to the Joint Status Report ("JSR") filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani and Defendants Gen Media Partners LLC, Sean B. Alger, and S.B. Alger Studio Productions LLC (see JSR) no later than December 30, 2022. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (cc: Defendant Bella and Holder via US mail) Modified to correct mail recipient list on 12/15/2022 (LH).
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 10. (Ford, Susan)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ANSWER to Plaintiff's #44 Amended Complaint by Louis Clyde Holder. (SS) (Updated Defendant's address on docket)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting Defendant's #64 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #44 Amended Complaint. Gen Media Partners LLC answer is now due 12/16/2022. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SS)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPLY, filed by Defendant Sloan Bella, TO RESPONSE to #45 MOTION to Dismiss (Bella, Sloan)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER: In light of Defendant Sloan Bella's 11/21/2022 filing (see Response (Dkt. #71 )), the court clarifies that it has not dismissed Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani's case against her. The court has only dismissed Mr. Al-Bustani's WPRA claim against her. Mr. Al-Bustani may continue to litigate his remaining claims against Ms. Bella. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (SS)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE re #70 Order by Defendant Sloan Bella (Bella, Sloan) Modified to add linkage on 11/22/2022 (LH).
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's #45 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re Dkt. #68 : This entry has been revised as a Notice to the Court, per the direction of chambers. (LH)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #58 #59 Motions for Default against Defendants Alger Studio and Mr. Alger. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE to the Court RESPONSE by Defendant Sloan Bella (Bella, Sloan) Modified title on 11/18/2022 (LH).
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Clyde Lewis. (AD)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ANSWER to #1 Complaint; First Amended by Sean B Alger and SB Alger Studio Productions LLC.(Hayton, Thomas) Modified filers and linkage on 11/17/2022 (SR). Modified on 11/17/2022 (SR).
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ANSWER to #1 Complaint; by Sean B Alger and SB Alger Studio Productions LLC.(Hayton, Thomas) Modified filers and linkage on 11/17/2022 (SR).
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #44 Amended Complaint, , filed by Defendant Gen Media Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/15/2022, (Morrison, James) Modified title on 11/16/2022 (LH).
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Kevin Garrity, Other Affiliate McGavren Investment Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Friedland Capital LLC, Other Affiliate Gresham Media Group Inc., Other Affiliate William J. McEntee III, Other Affiliate Warren Friedland for Gen Media Partners LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Gen Media Partners LLC (Morrison, James)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bryan C Taylor on behalf of Defendant Gen Media Partners LLC. (Taylor, Bryan)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James Raymond Morrison on behalf of Defendant Gen Media Partners LLC. (Morrison, James)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Kristie Williams, Invoke LLC (an Oregon limited liability company) and Dean Reiner, filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani. (Ford, Susan)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for Default against Sean B. Alger,, filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re entry of default) Noting Date 11/14/2022, (Ford, Susan)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION for Default against S.B. Alger Studio Productions LLC,, filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Enter Default) Noting Date 11/9/2022, (Ford, Susan)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Default against Louis Clyde Holder, a.k.a. Clyde Lewis,, filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Enter Default) Noting Date 11/8/2022, (Ford, Susan)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on GEN MEDIA PARTNERS LLC on 10/27/2022, filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani. (Ford, Susan)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REPLY, filed by Defendant Sloan Bella, TO RESPONSE to #12 #45 MOTION to Dismiss Party (Bella, Sloan) Modified linkage on 11/1/2022 (SS).
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Gen Media Partners LLC, James Maiden (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LH)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #44 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani (Attachments: #1 Summons GEN MEDIA PARTNERS LLC, #2 Summons JAMES MAIDEN)(Ford, Susan)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani, to #45 MOTION to Dismiss. (Ford, Susan)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #49 Motion for Extension of Time re Pretrial Deadlines. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is now 11/18/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is now 12/2/2022, Joint Status Report is now due by 12/9/2022. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 DECLARATION of Susan Ford filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani re #49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time re Pretrial Deadlines (Ford, Susan)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time re Pretrial Deadlines, filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Bustani. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/7/2022, (Ford, Susan)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re Defendants' #47 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Kristie Williams, Dean Reiner and Invoke, LLC may file their response to the Amended Complaint by 10/21/2022. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants Invoke LLC, Dean Reiner, Kristie Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/4/2022, (Wilker, Steven)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE by Defendant Sloan Bella (Bella, Sloan)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Noting Date Reset to 10/21/2022 re Dkt. #45 , which has been re-named as Defendant Bella's MOTION to Dismiss. (LH)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Defendant Sloan Bella. CROSS MOTION AND RESPONSE re #38 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint,, Noting Date 10/21/2022 9/27/2022, (Bella, Sloan) Modified on 9/28/2022 (LH).
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief and Damages for Copyright Infringement, Vicarious Copyright Infringement; Violation of WA Personality Rights Act; Invasion of Privacy; Intentional Infliction of Emotional Outrage; Negl. Infliction of Emotional Distress against defendant(s) Al-Hareth Al-Bustani with JURY DEMAND, filed by Al-Hareth Al-Bustani.(Ford, Susan)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 10/25/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/4/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/18/2022. (AD)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #38 Motion to Amend the Complaint. The court DIRECTS the clerk to correct the caption to reflect the proper spelling of Mr. Al-Bustani's name. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: The court DISMISSES Steve Outtrim, Evan Watson, and Harrison Lindley from this action. Mr. Al-Bustani's claims against these Defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Albustani, TO RESPONSE to #38 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint,, (Ford, Susan)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE, by Defendant Sloan Bella, to #38 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint,,. (Bella, Sloan)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint,,, filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Albustani. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint) Noting Date 9/16/2022, (Ford, Susan)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting Defendants' #36 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Kristie Williams, Dean Reiner and Invoke, LLC may file their response to the Complaint by 9/12/2022, or 21 days following the filing of an amended complaint, whichever is later. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SB)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants Invoke LLC, Dean Reiner, Kristie Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/11/2022, (Wilker, Steven)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Bella's #12 Motion to Dismiss Party. If Mr. Albustani wishes to amend his WPRA claim, he must submit an amended complaint by 8/30/2022. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Motion at dkt. #34 terminated and turned into Defendant's Reply re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Party, per the direction of chambers. (LH)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY to Response to CROSS MOTION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Party, filed by Defendant Sloan Bella. Noting Date 8/4/2020, (Bella, Sloan) Modified title on 8/5/2022 (LH).
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE: Defendant Sloan Bella has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (JF)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Albustani, to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Party. Oral Argument Requested. (Ford, Susan)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Alicia Taylor, filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Albustani. (Ford, Susan)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: The court DISCHARGES its order to show cause (Dkt. #17 ); DISMISSES Jane and John Does 1-10; and ORDERS Mr. Albustani to provide proof of service for the remaining un-served Defendants within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) (cc: Defendant Bella via US mail)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PRAECIPE to attach document (Corrected document) Response to Order to Show Cause re #17 Order to Show Cause, #27 Response to Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Albustani (Attachments: #1 Response to Order to Show Cause (with corrected Certificate of Service))(Ford, Susan)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECLARATION of Carol Kregear re #17 Order to Show Cause, #27 Response to Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Albustani (Ford, Susan)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Albustani re: #17 Order to Show Cause, (Ford, Susan)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Sloan Bella on 7/2/2022 6/15/2022 (Ford, Susan) Modified service date on 7/18/2022 (LH).
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Sean B Alger on 6/17/2022 (Ford, Susan)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant SB Alger Studio Productions LLC on 6/17/2022 (Ford, Susan)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Clyde Lewis on 7/10/2022 (Ford, Susan)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Kristie Williams on 6/20/2022 (Ford, Susan)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Invoke LLC on 6/20/2022 (Ford, Susan)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Dean Reiner on 6/20/2022 (Ford, Susan)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Change.org on 6/16/2022 (Ford, Susan)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Alicia Taylor on 6/17/2022 (Ford, Susan)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge James L. Robart. The court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE within ten (10) days of the date of this order why Defendants Steve Outtrim, Evan Watson, Harrison Lindley, Clyde Lewis, Kay Stone, and Jane and John Does 1-10 should not be dismissed for failure to comply with Rule 4(m). (AD) Modified on 7/13/2022 cc: Deft. Bella via US mail (AD).
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Noting Date Set for 8/5/2022 re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Party. At the direction of chambers, turned Defendant Bella's Answer into a Motion to Dismiss. Assigned noting date per LCR 7(d)(3). (LH) (cc: Copy of NEF to Defendant Bella via US mail)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Defendants' #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants Kristie Williams, Dean Reiner and Invoke, LLCs answer is due by 8/12/2022. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRAECIPE to attach document re #13 Notice of Appearance by Defendants Invoke LLC, Dean Reiner, Kristie Williams (Wilker, Steven)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The filings at dkt. #13 (Notice of Appearance) and dkt. #14 (Motion for Extension of Time) were improperly signed by Parna Mehrbani. As such, attorney Mehrbani was not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (LH) (cc: attorney Mehrbani via ECF ad hoc)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Attorney Parna A Mehrbani added for Invoke LLC, Dean Reiner, and Kristie Williams per #15 Praecipe to Attach Document, #13 Notice of Appearance. (LH)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Enter Appearance, filed by Defendants Invoke LLC, Dean Reiner, Kristie Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/11/2022, (Wilker, Steven)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Steven M Wilker on behalf of Defendants Invoke LLC, Dean Reiner, Kristie Williams. (Wilker, Steven)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Party ANSWER to re #1 Complaint, by Sloan Bella.(MW) Noted by Clerk for 8/5/2022. Modified to turn into motion on 7/13/2022 (LH).
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Attorney Thomas W Hayton added for Sean B Alger added, per #11 Notice of Appearance (LH)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas W Hayton on behalf of Defendant SB Alger Studio Productions LLC. (Hayton, Thomas)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Change.org (a Delaware public benefit corporation), filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Albustani. (Ford, Susan)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Clyde Lewis (LH)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Albustani (Attachments: #1 Summons defendant Clyde Lewis aka Louis Clyde Holder)(Ford, Susan)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Timothy J Billick on behalf of Defendant Alicia Taylor. (Billick, Timothy)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Alpha Media LLC (a Delaware limited liability company), filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Albustani. (Ford, Susan)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Sean B Alger, Alpha Media LLC, Sloan Bella, Change.org, Invoke LLC, Clyde Lewis, Harrison Lindley, Steve Outtrim, Dean Reiner, SB Alger Studio Productions LLC, Kay Stone, Alicia Taylor, Evan Watson, Kristie Williams (LH)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Albustani (Attachments: #1 Summons ALGER, Sean B., #2 Summons Alpha Media LLC, #3 Summons BELLA, Sloan, #4 Summons Change.org, #5 Summons Invoke, LLC, #6 Summons LEWIS, Clyde, #7 Summons LINDLEY, Harrison, #8 Summons OUTTRIM, Steve, #9 Summons REINER, Dean, #10 Summons S.B. Alger Studio Productions LLC, #11 Summons STONE, Kay, #12 Summons TAYLOR, Alicia, #13 Summons WATSON, Evan, #14 Summons WILLIAMS, Kristie)(Ford, Susan)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Copyright/Patent/Trademark Forms Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (AMD)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge James L. Robart added. (AMD)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff Al-Hareth Al-Albustani. (Ford, Susan)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF AND DAMAGES against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7510857) Attorney Susan L Ford added to party Al-Hareth Al-Albustani(pty:pla), filed by Al-Hareth Al-Albustani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ford, Susan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/3/2022: #2 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121)) (LH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Bustani v. Alger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean B Alger
Represented By: Thomas W Hayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Outtrim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Taylor
Represented By: Timothy J Billick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.B. Alger Studio Productions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison Lindley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashlea Stinnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristie Williams
Represented By: Parna A Mehrbani
Represented By: Steven M Wilker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invoke, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Reiner
Represented By: Parna A Mehrbani
Represented By: Steven M Wilker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sloan Bella
Represented By: Sloan Bella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Change.org
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Alger Studio Productions LLC
Represented By: Thomas W Hayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invoke LLC
Represented By: Parna A Mehrbani
Represented By: Steven M Wilker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Clyde Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Maiden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gen Media Partners LLC doing business as G Networks
Represented By: Bryan C Taylor
Represented By: James Raymond Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Networks LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Audio Networks LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al-Hareth Al-Albustani
Represented By: Susan L Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al-Hareth Al-Bustani
Represented By: Susan L Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?