Ward v. Bank of America
Plaintiff: James H Ward
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. and Bank of America
Case Number: 3:2022cv05252
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2022 Filing 10 REPLY, filed by Defendant Bank of America, TO RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Stastny, Douglas)
June 6, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff James H Ward, to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Jason)
May 16, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas C Stastny on behalf of Defendant Bank of America. (Stastny, Douglas)
May 13, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bank of America (Stastny, Douglas)
May 13, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , filed by Defendant Bank of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/10/2022, (Stastny, Douglas)
April 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas Tyler Santiago on behalf of Plaintiff James H Ward. (Santiago, Thomas)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Joint Status Report due by 7/19/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/5/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/12/2022. (DK)
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SP)
April 19, 2022 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Bank of America. (SP)
April 19, 2022 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Bank of America, N.A. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7516568), filed by James H Ward. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H Ward
Represented By: Jason D Anderson
Represented By: Thomas Tyler Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Douglas C Stastny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?