Huisingh et al v. Lawson et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Huisingh and Valerie Huisingh
Defendant: Leon Lawson doing business as Dogcon Auto LLC, Rikki L Lawson and Any Other Unknown Occupants
Cross Defendant: Leon Lawson
Case Number: 3:2022cv05278
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David G Estudillo
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING PLAINITFFS' #11 MOTION FOR REMAND. The matter is remanded to Mason County Superior Court. Per LCR 3(i), case will be remanded on the 15th day following the date of this Order, on 7/1/2022. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (AMD)
June 3, 2022 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #12 Response to Motion,, To Remand & Defendants Motion to Strike (Lawson, Rikki)
June 2, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE, by Defendant Rikki L Lawson, to #11 MOTION to Remand . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplement ERRP mason co, #2 Exhibit Supplement Orm, #3 Exhibit Supplement cfpb, #4 Exhibit Supplement taxes, #5 Exhibit Supplement purchse opt 2017, #6 Exhibit Supplement interviews, #7 Exhibit Supplement purchase opt 2019, #8 Exhibit Supplement Navy and easement, #9 Exhibit Supplement OFAC directive 4, #10 Exhibit Supplement clerks, #11 Exhibit Supplement irs and drafts)(Lawson, Rikki) Modified attachment names on 6/2/2022 per defendant (AMD).
June 2, 2022 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #12 Response to Motion: Modified attachment names at the request of defendant. (AMD)
May 11, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Raymond Huisingh. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand) Noting Date 6/3/2022, (Nichols, Julie)
May 9, 2022 Filing 10 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS certification by Defendant Rikki L Lawson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit verification of state records)(Lawson, Rikki)
May 9, 2022 Filing 9 PRAECIPE re #7 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim by Defendant Rikki L Lawson (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration Mr Lawson to answer complaint, #2 Supplement Declaration Mrs Lawson to answer complaint)(Lawson, Rikki)
May 2, 2022 Filing 7 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal, with JURY DEMAND Included, CROSSCLAIM against defendant All Defendants by Rikki L Lawson.(Lawson, Rikki)
April 29, 2022 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Leon A Lawson, Other Affiliate Dogcon Auto LLC for Rikki L Lawson. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Rikki L Lawson (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Formation, #2 Supplement Business Information)(Lawson, Rikki)
April 29, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE: Defendant Rikki L Lawson has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
April 29, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE: Defendant Leon Lawson has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. The party was directed to enter their appearance in accordance with LCR 83.2 if necessary. (KB) Modified on 4/29/2022 to add language re LCR 83.2 (KB).
April 29, 2022 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #4 Notice re Pro Se Registration: Modified on 4/29/2022 to add that Defendant was directed to enter an appearance in accordance with LCR 83.2 (if necessary). (KB)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/12/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/19/2022, Joint Status Report due by 7/26/2022, Status Conference set for 7/29/2022 at 9:30 AM via Zoom before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. cc: Defs via mail (MGC)
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Mason County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (AMD - cc: defts)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mason County Superior Court, case number 22-2-00174-23; (Receipt # TAC016978), filed by Rikki L Lawson. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Documents re 22-2-00174-23, #3 State Court Documents re 21-2-00521-23, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(AMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huisingh et al v. Lawson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Huisingh
Represented By: Julie M. Nichols
Represented By: Stephen T. Whitehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Huisingh
Represented By: Julie M. Nichols
Represented By: Stephen T. Whitehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Lawson doing business as Dogcon Auto LLC
Represented By: Leon Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rikki L Lawson
Represented By: Rikki L Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any Other Unknown Occupants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Leon Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?