Maverick Gaming LLC v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Maverick Gaming LLC
Defendant: United States of America, United States Department of the Interior, Deb Haaland, Bryan Newland, Jay Inslee, Robert Ferguson, Bud Sizemore, Julia Patterson, Alicia Levy, Kristine Reeves, Sarah Lawson, Steve Conway, Jeff Holy, Shelley Kloba, Brandon Vick and Tina Griffin
Intervenor: Shoalwater Bay Tribe
Amicus Curiae: Suquamish Tribe, Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation, Hoh Indian Tribe, Kalispel Tribe of Indians, Makah Indian Tribe, Nisqually Indian Tribe, Nooksack Indian Tribe, Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe, Puyallup Tribe of Indians, Quinault Tribe, Samish Indian Nation, Skokomish Indian Tribe, Spokane Tribe, Squaxin Tribe, Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, Tulalip Tribes and Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation
Case Number: 3:2022cv05325
Filed: May 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David G Estudillo
Referring Judge: David G Estudillo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER/APPEAL NUMBER 23-35136 for #100 Notice of Appeal filed by Maverick Gaming LLC. (AMD)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (23-35136) re #98 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #99 Judgment by Court by Plaintiff Maverick Gaming LLC. $505, receipt number AWAWDC-7900154 (cc: USCA) (Attachments: #1 Representation Statement)(Brennan, Thomas) Modified on 2/24/2023 to add CCA # only (AMD).
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 JUDGMENT BY COURT. Limited Intervenor Shoalwater Bay Indian Tribe of the Shoalwater Bay Indian Reservation's ("Shoalwater") motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. #85 ) is GRANTED and Maverick'sclaims are dismissed without prejudice. (MW)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting Shoalwater's #85 Motion to Dismiss. Maverick's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo.(MW)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 REPLY, filed by Intervenor Shoalwater Bay Tribe, TO RESPONSE to #85 MOTION to Dismiss (Crowell, Scott)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Maverick Gaming LLC, to #85 MOTION to Dismiss . (Brennan, Thomas)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 RESPONSE, by Defendants Steve Conway, Robert Ferguson, Tina Griffin, Jeff Holy, Jay Inslee, Shelley Kloba, Sarah Lawson, Alicia Levy, Julia Patterson, Kristine Reeves, Bud Sizemore, Brandon Vick, to #85 MOTION to Dismiss . (Beneski, Kristin)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 RESPONSE, by Defendants Deb Haaland, Bryan Newland, United States Department of the Interior, United States of America, to #85 MOTION to Dismiss . (Ross, Rebecca)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER re #89 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Leonard R Powell for Amicus Suquamish Tribe by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER re #88 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Keith M Harper for Amicus Suquamish Tribe by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting Amici Tribes' #87 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. The amicus brief attached as Dkt. No. 87-1 is hereby deemed filed on the date of this order. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo.(MW) (Main Document 91 replaced with updated signature date on 10/17/2022) (MW).
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Timothy Woolsey on behalf of Amicus Suquamish Tribe. (Woolsey, Timothy)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Leonard R. Powell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus the Suquamish Tribe (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7735654 (Woolsey, Timothy)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Keith M. Harper FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus the Suquamish Tribe (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7735653 (Woolsey, Timothy)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #87 MOTION for Leave to File / Non-Party Tribes' Consent Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Limited Intervenor Shoalwater Bay Tribe's Motion to Dismiss : Modified on 10/12/2022 to indicate that docket entry was filed by Amicus party added as the Suquamish Tribe, not Intervenor Shoalwater Bay Tribe. (KB)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTE: Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief #87 was filed incorrectly/improperly. Appearance of attorney Tim Woolsey is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (MW)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to File / Non-Party Tribes' Consent Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Limited Intervenor Shoalwater Bay Tribe's Motion to Dismiss, filed by Intervenor Shoalwater Bay Tribe Non-Party Tribes (the Suquamish Tribe). (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - (Proposed) Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Attachment B - Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/11/2022, (Woolsey, Timothy) Modified on 10/12/2022 to update docket entry filer (KB).
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 DECLARATION of Charlene Nelson filed by Intervenor Shoalwater Bay Tribe re #85 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-1, #2 Exhibit B-2, #3 Exhibit B-3, #4 Exhibit B-4)(Crowell, Scott)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Intervenor Shoalwater Bay Tribe. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 10/28/2022, (Crowell, Scott)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting Shoalwater Bay Tribe's #68 Motion to Intervene. Shoalwater Bay Tribe shall file its Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. #68 -1) no later than 10/3/2022. Plaintiff and Defendants shall submit their responses by 10/24/2022 and Shoalwater Bay Tribe shall submit its reply by 10/28/2022. The briefing schedule (Dkt. No. #63 ) remains STAYED. The Court amends its prior order (Dkt. No. #81 at 8) and does not require the parties to meet and confer to set deadlines for dispositive motions for submission 10 days after the Court's order on the Tribe's Motion for Limited Intervention. The Court orders the parties to meet and confer to set deadlines for dispositive motions and submit a joint motion to the Court no later than 10 days after the Court's decision on the Tribe's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo.(MW)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 RESPONSE SUPPLEMENT re #82 Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Shoalwater Bay Tribe by Plaintiff Maverick Gaming LLC (Brennan, Thomas) Modified on 9/20/2022 (MW).
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #68 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott D Crowell added to party Shoalwater Bay Tribe(pty:intv) by Intervenor Shoalwater Bay Tribe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Crowell, Scott)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting Intervenor Shoalwater Bay Tribe's #69 Motion for Relief from Summary Judgment Deadlines. The briefing schedule (Dkt. No. #63 ) is STAYED. The parties shall meet and confer to set deadlines for dispositive motions and submit a joint motion to the Court no later than 10 days after the Court's decision on the Tribe's Motion for Limited Intervention. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo.(MW)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 DECLARATION of Scott Crowell in Support of Motion for Limited Intervention filed by Intervenor Shoalwater Bay Tribe re #68 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott D Crowell added to party Shoalwater Bay Tribe(pty:intv) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Scott Crowell, #2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Scott Crowell, #3 Exhibit 3(A) to Declaration of Scott Crowell, #4 Exhibit 3(B) to Declaration of Scott Crowell, #5 Exhibit 3(C) to Declaration of Scott Crowell, #6 Exhibit 3(D) to Declaration of Scott Crowell, #7 Exhibit 3(E) to Declaration of Scott Crowell)(Crowell, Scott)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPLY, filed by Intervenor Shoalwater Bay Tribe, TO RESPONSE to #68 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott D Crowell added to party Shoalwater Bay Tribe(pty:intv) (Crowell, Scott)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Maverick Gaming LLC, to #68 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott D Crowell added to party Shoalwater Bay Tribe(pty:intv). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brennan, Thomas)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 DECLARATION of Jonathan Chavez re #75 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Maverick Gaming LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Brennan, Thomas)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 DECLARATION of Eric Persson re #75 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Maverick Gaming LLC (Brennan, Thomas)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff Maverick Gaming LLC. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/4/2022, (Brennan, Thomas)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 DECLARATION of Scott Crowell in Support of Motion for Relief from Summary Judgment Deadlines filed by Intervenor Shoalwater Bay Tribe re #69 MOTION for Relief From Summary Judgment Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Scott Crowell)(Crowell, Scott)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPLY, filed by Intervenor Shoalwater Bay Tribe, TO RESPONSE to #69 MOTION for Relief From Summary Judgment Deadlines (Crowell, Scott)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #69 MOTION for Relief From Summary Judgment Deadlines, by Defendants Steve Conway, Robert Ferguson, Tina Griffin, Jeff Holy, Jay Inslee, Shelley Kloba, Sarah Lawson, Alicia Levy, Julia Patterson, Kristine Reeves, Bud Sizemore, Brandon Vick. (Rowe, Brian)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Maverick Gaming LLC, to #69 MOTION for Relief From Summary Judgment Deadlines. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brennan, Thomas)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Shoalwater Bay Tribe (Crowell, Scott)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION for Relief From Summary Judgment Deadlines, filed by Intervenor Shoalwater Bay Tribe. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Relief from Summary Judgment Deadlines) Noting Date 8/12/2022, (Crowell, Scott)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION to Intervene Attorney Scott D Crowell added to party Shoalwater Bay Tribe(pty:intv), filed by Intervenor Shoalwater Bay Tribe. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit B-Declaration of Charlene Nelson, #3 Exhibit B-1 to Declaration of Charlene Nelson, #4 Exhibit B-2 to Declaration of Charlene Nelson, #5 Exhibit B-3 to Declaration of Charlene Nelson, #6 Exhibit B-4 to Declaration of Charlene Nelson, #7 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Limited Intervention) Noting Date 8/19/2022, (Crowell, Scott)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Filing of the Certified Administrative Record ; filed by Defendants Deb Haaland, Bryan Newland, United States Department of the Interior, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000001, #2 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000022, #3 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000024, #4 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000047, #5 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000073, #6 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000103, #7 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000131, #8 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000135, #9 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000139, #10 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000143, #11 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000144, #12 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000145, #13 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000146, #14 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000149, #15 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000152, #16 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000176, #17 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000178, #18 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000179, #19 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000205, #20 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000206, #21 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000209, #22 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000245, #23 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000273, #24 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000351, #25 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000378, #26 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000406, #27 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000641, #28 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000643, #29 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000645, #30 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000646, #31 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000647, #32 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000649, #33 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000650, #34 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000651, #35 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000703, #36 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000704, #37 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000705, #38 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000706, #39 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000707, #40 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000708, #41 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000709, #42 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000710, #43 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000711, #44 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000712, #45 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000713, #46 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000714, #47 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000715, #48 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000716, #49 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000717, #50 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000718, #51 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000719, #52 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000723, #53 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000750, #54 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000751, #55 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000783, #56 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000787, #57 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000788, #58 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000789, #59 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0000790, #60 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0001047, #61 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0001048, #62 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0001075, #63 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0001076, #64 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0001077, #65 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0001078, #66 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0001107, #67 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0001108, #68 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0001111, #69 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0001159, #70 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0001160, #71 Exhibit Maverick_v_DOI_0001161)(Ross, Rebecca)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Unopposed AMENDED COMPLAINT Correcting Caption against All Defendants, filed by Maverick Gaming LLC.(Brennan, Thomas)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #64 Amended Complaint. ***Action Required***See attached letter for more information and instructions. (AMD)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Unopposed AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Maverick Gaming LLC.(Brennan, Thomas)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #60 Stipulated Motion for Relief from Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 7/1/2022, Plaintiff's Dispositive motion due by 9/12/2022, Defendants' Dispositive motions due by 9/12/2022, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/1/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/8/2022, Joint Status Report due by 8/15/2022, Administrative Record due by 7/15/2022 signed by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo.(ZMG)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo- Dep Clerk: Gretchen Craft; Pla Counsel: Lochlan Shelfer, Matthew McGill, Thomas Brennan; Def Counsel: Hillary Hoffman, Kristin Beneski, Tera Heintz; CR: Angela Nicolavo; Time of Hearing: 1:30; Courtroom: Zoom; Motion Hearing held on 6/28/2022 re #60 Stipulated MOTION for Relief from Deadlines and Proposing Briefing Schedule filed by Maverick Gaming LLC. Court GRANTS the parties motion as requested. Order will be entered. (MGC)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE of Hearing on #60 Stipulated MOTION for Relief from Deadlines and Proposing Briefing Schedule: Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2022 at 1:30 PM via Zoom before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (MGC)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Stipulated MOTION for Relief from Deadlines and Proposing Briefing Schedule, filed by Plaintiff Maverick Gaming LLC. Noting Date 6/21/2022, (Brennan, Thomas)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William McGinty on behalf of Defendants Steve Conway, Robert Ferguson, Jeff Holy, Jay Inslee, Shelley Kloba, Sarah Lawson, Alicia Levy, Julia Patterson, Kristine Reeves, Bud Sizemore, Brandon Vick. (McGinty, William)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Pending Motion re #35 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Washington State Defendants ; filed by Plaintiff Maverick Gaming LLC. (Brennan, Thomas)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/1/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/8/2022, Joint Status Report due by 8/15/2022, Status Conference set for 8/23/2022 at 9:30 AM via Zoom before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (MGC)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re #53 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Theodore B Olson for Plaintiff Maverick Gaming LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re #51 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lochlan F Shelfer for Maverick Gaming LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re #52 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew D McGill for Plaintiff Maverick Gaming LLC by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Theodore B. Olson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Maverick Gaming LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7552749 (Brennan, Thomas)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew D. McGill FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Maverick Gaming LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7552746 (Brennan, Thomas)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lochlan F. Shelfer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Maverick Gaming LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7552730 (Brennan, Thomas)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Maverick Gaming LLC (Brennan, Thomas)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas Matthew Brennan on behalf of Plaintiff Maverick Gaming LLC. (Brennan, Thomas)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from the District of Columbia and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment; and information regarding future notice and LCR 83.1(d)(1) which requires association with local counsel and instructions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (AMD)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia, Case Number 1:22-cv-00068.
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo added. (AMD)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Lochlan Francis Shelfer on behalf of MAVERICK GAMING LLC (zjf) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Florence Y. Pan: Motion Hearing held via video on 4/28/2022 re #30 MOTION to Transfer Case and #35 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Oral arguments heard. #30 Motion to Transfer Case is GRANTED. This case will be transferred to the Western District of Washington. #35 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint will be addressed by the transferee court. Transfer due by 5/8/2022. (Court Reporter Nancy Meyer.) (zacr) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Lochlan F. Shelfer is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Plaintiff Maverick Gaming LLC. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 4/27/2022. (lcsw) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lochlan F. Shelfer, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9197058. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MAVERICK GAMING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McGill, Matthew) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca M. Ross on behalf of DEB HAALAND, BRYAN NEWLAND, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Ross, Rebecca) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF HEARING: Motions Hearing set for 4/28/2022 at 2:00 PM via Zoom videoconference before Judge Florence Y. Pan. (zacr) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 REPLY to opposition to motion re #35 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Washington State Defendants filed by MAVERICK GAMING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RESPONSE re #35 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Washington State Defendants filed by STEVE CONWAY, ROBERT FERGUSON, TINA GRIFFIN, JEFF HOLY, JAY INSLEE, SHELLEY KLOBA, SARAH LAWSON, ALICIA LEVY, JULIA PATTERSON, KRISTINE REEVES, BUD SIZEMORE, BRANDON VICK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Motion to file Amended Complaint)(Beneski, Kristin) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY to opposition re #30 MOTION to Transfer Case , filed by STEVE CONWAY, ROBERT FERGUSON, TINA GRIFFIN, JEFF HOLY, JAY INSLEE, SHELLEY KLOBA, SARAH LAWSON, ALICIA LEVY, JULIA PATTERSON, KRISTINE REEVES, BUD SIZEMORE, BRANDON VICK. (Rowe, Brian) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Tera M. Heintz on behalf of STEVE CONWAY, ROBERT FERGUSON, TINA GRIFFIN, JEFF HOLY, JAY INSLEE, SHELLEY KLOBA, SARAH LAWSON, ALICIA LEVY, JULIA PATTERSON, KRISTINE REEVES, BUD SIZEMORE, BRANDON VICK (Heintz, Tera) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 3/16/2022. (lcsw) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPLY to opposition to motion re #31 MOTION to Stay filed by STEVE CONWAY, ROBERT FERGUSON, TINA GRIFFIN, JEFF HOLY, JAY INSLEE, SHELLEY KLOBA, SARAH LAWSON, ALICIA LEVY, JULIA PATTERSON, KRISTINE REEVES, BUD SIZEMORE, BRANDON VICK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Mtn Stay)(Rowe, Brian) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #34 Amended Complaint was entered in error and refiled as DE#35 .(zjf) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Memorandum in opposition to re #30 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by MAVERICK GAMING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Proposed Order by MAVERICK GAMING LLC re #35 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Washington State Defendants (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss Washington State Defendants by MAVERICK GAMING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Redline Comparison of Original and Amended Complaint)(Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENTERED IN ERROR.....AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by MAVERICK GAMING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Redline Comparison of Original and Amended Complaint)(Olson, Theodore) Modified on 3/11/2022 (zjf). [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Change of Address by Theodore B. Olson (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Hunt Rowe on behalf of STEVE CONWAY, ROBERT FERGUSON, TINA GRIFFIN, JEFF HOLY, JAY INSLEE, SHELLEY KLOBA, SARAH LAWSON, ALICIA LEVY, JULIA PATTERSON, KRISTINE REEVES, BUD SIZEMORE, BRANDON VICK (Rowe, Brian) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Stay by STEVE CONWAY, ROBERT FERGUSON, TINA GRIFFIN, JEFF HOLY, JAY INSLEE, SHELLEY KLOBA, SARAH LAWSON, ALICIA LEVY, JULIA PATTERSON, KRISTINE REEVES, BUD SIZEMORE, BRANDON VICK. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay)(Beneski, Kristin) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Transfer Case by STEVE CONWAY, ROBERT FERGUSON, TINA GRIFFIN, JEFF HOLY, JAY INSLEE, SHELLEY KLOBA, SARAH LAWSON, ALICIA LEVY, JULIA PATTERSON, KRISTINE REEVES, BUD SIZEMORE, BRANDON VICK. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer, #2 Declaration of Brian H. Rowe ISO Mtn Transfer, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Brian H. Rowe)(Beneski, Kristin) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #28 MOTION for Limited Admission of Brian H. Rowe under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d). Defendant is directed to proceed in accordance with LCvR 83.2(f), which applies to attorneys employed by a state. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 2/22/2022. (lcsw) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #29 MOTION for Limited Admission of Tera Heintz under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d). Defendant is directed to proceed in accordance with LCvR 83.2(f), which applies to attorneys employed by a state. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 2/22/2022. (lcsw) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Limited Admission of Tera Heintz by ROBERT FERGUSON. (Beneski, Kristin) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Limited Admission of Brian H. Rowe by ROBERT FERGUSON. (Beneski, Kristin) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Daron Tate Carreiro on behalf of DEB HAALAND, BRYAN NEWLAND, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Carreiro, Daron) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Hillary Hoffman on behalf of DEB HAALAND, BRYAN NEWLAND, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hoffman, Hillary) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Beneski on behalf of STEVE CONWAY, ROBERT FERGUSON, TINA GRIFFIN, JEFF HOLY, JAY INSLEE, SHELLEY KLOBA, SARAH LAWSON, ALICIA LEVY, JULIA PATTERSON, KRISTINE REEVES, BUD SIZEMORE, BRANDON VICK (Beneski, Kristin) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE. TINA GRIFFIN waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BRANDON VICK waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE. SHELLEY KLOBA waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE. JEFF HOLY waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE. STEVE CONWAY waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE. SARAH LAWSON waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE. KRISTINE REEVES waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ALICIA LEVY waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE. JULIA PATTERSON waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE. BUD SIZEMORE waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BRYAN NEWLAND served on 1/21/2022 (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEB HAALAND served on 1/21/2022 (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 1/21/2022 (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/26/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/27/2022. (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/24/22. (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE. ROBERT FERGUSON waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE. JAY INSLEE waiver sent on 1/21/2022, answer due 3/22/2022. (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS (16) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 1/11/2022. (lcsw) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET by MAVERICK GAMING LLC re #1 Complaint, filed by MAVERICK GAMING LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by MAVERICK GAMING LLC.(Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MAVERICK GAMING LLC (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. McGill on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McGill, Matthew) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore B. Olson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8972495) filed by MAVERICK GAMING LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons)(Olson, Theodore) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 5/9/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maverick Gaming LLC v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maverick Gaming LLC
Represented By: Matthew D McGill
Represented By: Lochlan Francis Shelfer
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Theodore B. Olson
Represented By: Lochlan F Shelfer
Represented By: Theodore B Olson
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Daron Tate Carreiro
Represented By: Hillary Hoffman
Represented By: Rebecca M. Ross
Represented By: Daron T Carreiro
Represented By: Hillary K Hoffman
Represented By: Rebecca M Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Daron Tate Carreiro
Represented By: Hillary Hoffman
Represented By: Rebecca M. Ross
Represented By: Daron T Carreiro
Represented By: Hillary K Hoffman
Represented By: Rebecca M Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Haaland
Represented By: Daron Tate Carreiro
Represented By: Hillary Hoffman
Represented By: Rebecca M. Ross
Represented By: Daron T Carreiro
Represented By: Hillary K Hoffman
Represented By: Rebecca M Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Newland
Represented By: Daron Tate Carreiro
Represented By: Hillary Hoffman
Represented By: Rebecca M. Ross
Represented By: Daron T Carreiro
Represented By: Hillary K Hoffman
Represented By: Rebecca M Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Inslee
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Brian Hunt Rowe
Represented By: Tera M Heintz
Represented By: William McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ferguson
Represented By: Brian Hunt Rowe
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Tera M Heintz
Represented By: William McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bud Sizemore
Represented By: Brian Hunt Rowe
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Tera M Heintz
Represented By: William McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Patterson
Represented By: Tera M Heintz
Represented By: Brian Hunt Rowe
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: William McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Levy
Represented By: Brian Hunt Rowe
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Tera M Heintz
Represented By: William McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Reeves
Represented By: Brian Hunt Rowe
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Tera M Heintz
Represented By: William McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Lawson
Represented By: Brian Hunt Rowe
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Tera M Heintz
Represented By: William McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Conway
Represented By: Brian Hunt Rowe
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Tera M Heintz
Represented By: William McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Holy
Represented By: Brian Hunt Rowe
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Tera M Heintz
Represented By: William McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley Kloba
Represented By: Brian Hunt Rowe
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Tera M Heintz
Represented By: William McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Vick
Represented By: Brian Hunt Rowe
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Tera M Heintz
Represented By: William McGinty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Griffin
Represented By: Brian Hunt Rowe
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Tera M Heintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Shoalwater Bay Tribe
Represented By: Scott D Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Suquamish Tribe
Represented By: Keith M Harper
Represented By: Leonard R Powell
Represented By: Timothy Woolsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Hoh Indian Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kalispel Tribe of Indians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Makah Indian Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nisqually Indian Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nooksack Indian Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Port Gamble S'Klallam Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Puyallup Tribe of Indians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Quinault Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Samish Indian Nation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Skokomish Indian Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Spokane Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Squaxin Tribe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Swinomish Indian Tribal Community
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tulalip Tribes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Confederated Tribes and Bands of the Yakama Nation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?