Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company et al v. GM Northrup Corporation
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company and Hanover Insurance Company
Defendant: GM Northrup Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv05465
Filed: June 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Filing 26 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of Minnesota and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (AMD)
June 27, 2022 Filing 25 Case transferred in from the District of Minnesota, Case Number 0:22-cv-00699. Documents 1-25 received electronically; documents 2, 6, 11, 23 and 25 are text-only.
June 27, 2022 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (AMD)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting Defendant's Motion to Transfer #12 . See Order for details. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/22/2022. (BJP) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (Text-Only) ORDER Cancelling Hearing: The hearing #13 on Defendant's Motion to Stay, Dismiss, or Transfer #12 set for 6/22/2022 is CANCELED. The motion will be decided on the papers without oral argument. Ordered by Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/13/2022. (BJP) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
May 27, 2022 Filing 22 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by G.M. Northrup Corporation with Declaration of Jason Lien and Exhibit A Attached. (Lien, Jason) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
May 6, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G.M. Northrup Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lien, Jason) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gill, Ryan) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General. Within 30 days of the motions being decided, Plaintiff shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by letter or e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/18/2022. (HAM) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
April 15, 2022 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G.M. Northrup Corporation.(Lien, Jason) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
April 15, 2022 Filing 17 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #12 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by G.M. Northrup Corporation.(Lien, Jason) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
April 15, 2022 Filing 16 Declaration of John Northrup in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G.M. Northrup Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s))(Lien, Jason) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
April 15, 2022 Filing 15 Declaration of Charles K. Davis in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G.M. Northrup Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s))(Lien, Jason) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
April 15, 2022 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G.M. Northrup Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lien, Jason) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
April 15, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Lien, Jason) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
April 15, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by G.M. Northrup Corporation. (Lien, Jason) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Charles K. Davis for G.M. Northrup Corporation.; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Todd C Hayes for G.M. Northrup Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/4/2022. (JGK) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
April 1, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Todd C. Hayes. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9420717 filed by G.M. Northrup Corporation. (Lien, Jason) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
April 1, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Charles K. Davis. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9420681 filed by G.M. Northrup Corporation. (Lien, Jason) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
April 1, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A Lien on behalf of G.M. Northrup Corporation. (Lien, Jason) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
March 31, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company, Hanover Insurance Company. G.M. Northrup Corporation served on 3/30/2022, answer due 4/20/2022. (Gill, Ryan) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Perry Shorris for Hanover Insurance Company and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 3/21/2022. (ABR) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
March 21, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Perry M. Shorris. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9397283 filed by Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Gill, Ryan) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
March 18, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Hanover Insurance Company, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Beyer, Matthew) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
March 17, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to G.M. Northrup Corporation. (MMG) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
March 17, 2022 Filing 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Katherine M. Menendez per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 22-cv-699 KMM/TNL. (MMG) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against G.M. Northrup Corporation (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9390169) filed by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company, Hanover Insurance Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gill, Ryan) [Transferred from mnd on 6/27/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company et al v. GM Northrup Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Perry M Shorris
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Gill
Represented By: Matthew Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan Christopher Gill
Represented By: Matthew Beyer
Represented By: Perry M Shorris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GM Northrup Corporation
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Represented By: Todd Christopher Hayes
Represented By: Anna F. Barton
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: David E Suchar
Represented By: Jason A Lien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?