Richmond et al v. Home Partners Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Frank Richmond, Michael McDermott and Kelley McDermott
Defendant: Home Partners Holdings LLC, HP Washington I LLC, HPA Borrower 2017-I LLC, OPVHHJV LLC, HPA Borrower 2017-1 LLC and OPVHHJV LLC doing business as Pathlight Property Management
Case Number: 3:2022cv05704
Filed: September 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lindsey L Larson for Plaintiffs Kelley McDermott, Michael McDermott, and Frank Richmond by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anne T Regan for Plaintiffs Kelley McDermott, Michael McDermott, and Frank Richmond by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Scott Harris for Plaintiffs Kelley McDermott, Michael McDermott, and Frank Richmond by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lindsey L. Larson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Kelley McDermott, Michael McDermott, Frank Richmond (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7729184 (Lemmon, Andrew)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anne T. Regan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Kelley McDermott, Michael McDermott, Frank Richmond (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7729180 (Lemmon, Andrew)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Scott Harris FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Kelley McDermott, Michael McDermott, Frank Richmond (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7729154 (Lemmon, Andrew)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant OPVHHJV LLC mailed on 9/22/2022 (Lemmon, Andrew)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant HP Washington I LLC mailed on 9/22/2022 (Lemmon, Andrew)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant HPA Borrower 2017-1 LLC mailed on 9/22/2022 (Lemmon, Andrew)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Home Partners Holdings LLC mailed on 9/22/2022 (Lemmon, Andrew)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) HP Washington I LLC, HPA Borrower 2017-I LLC, Home Partners Holdings LLC, OPVHHJV LLC (MW)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge David W. Christel added. (MW)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7710850) Attorney Andrew Lemmon added to party Kelley McDermott(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Lemmon added to party Michael McDermott(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Lemmon added to party Frank Richmond(pty:pla), filed by Frank Richmond, Kelley McDermott, Michael McDermott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Home Partners Holdings LLC, #3 Summons as to HP Washington I LLC, #4 Summons as to HPA Borrower 2017-I LLC, #5 Summons as to OPVHHJV LLC)(Lemmon, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richmond et al v. Home Partners Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Richmond
Represented By: Andrew Lemmon
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Represented By: Lindsey L Larson
Represented By: Scott Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McDermott
Represented By: Andrew Lemmon
Represented By: Scott Harris
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Represented By: Lindsey L Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley McDermott
Represented By: Andrew Lemmon
Represented By: Anne T Regan
Represented By: Lindsey L Larson
Represented By: Scott Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Partners Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Washington I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HPA Borrower 2017-I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPVHHJV LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HPA Borrower 2017-1 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPVHHJV LLC doing business as Pathlight Property Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?