City Beverages LLC v. Crown Imports LLC et al
Plaintiff: City Beverages, L.L.C., d/b/a Olympic Eagle Distributing, a Missouri limited liability company with its principal place of business in Washington and City Beverages LLC a Missouri limited liability company with its principal place of business in Washington doing business as Olympic Eagle Distributing
Defendant: Crown Imports LLC, d/b/a Constellation Brands Beer Division, a Delaware corporation with its principal place of business in Illinois, Constellation Brands, Inc, a Delaware corporation with its principal place of business in New York, Crown Imports LLC a Delaware corporation with its principal place of business in Illinois doing business as Constellation Brands Beer Division and Constellation Brands Inc
Case Number: 3:2022cv05756
Filed: October 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David G Estudillo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER re #46 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Constellation Brands Inc, Crown Imports LLC re #40 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order: If Plaintiff wishes to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, it should do so by 12/5/2022. The response shall not exceed 8 pages. Authorized by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (MGC)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Reconsideration re #40 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #45 Order, filed by Defendants Constellation Brands Inc, Crown Imports LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/22/2022, (Brain, Christopher Boyd, Kaleigh) Modified on 11/23/2022 (AMD).
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DKT. NO. #28 ). The temporary restraining order shall remain in effect until this Court issues a ruling on Olympic Eagle's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. No. #4 ). Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo. (AMD)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TRO Hearing held on 11/8/2022 before Judge David G. Estudillo.Parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at #www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript, contact court reporter Barry Fanning, barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 253-882-3833. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2023, (BF)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION Regarding Bond by parties re 41 TRO Hearing,,, (Brain, Christopher)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 11/08/2022 re 41 TRO Hearing.Posting of this Transcript Order form does not constitute an official request for transcript(s). If you have not already done so, you MUST contact the individual court reporter(s), Barry Fanning (barry_fanning@wawd.uscourts.gov, 253-882-3833) to make payment arrangements and secure your desired delivery time. (EN)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo- Dep Clerk: Gretchen Craft; Pla Counsel: Michael Vaska, Angelo Marchesini, Benjamin Hodges, Thomas Ahearne, Shawn Bai (CFO for Olympic Eagle); Def Counsel: Christopher Brain, Kaleigh Boyd, John Williams (VP, GM for Crown Imports); CR: Barry Fanning; Time of Hearing: 2:45; Courtroom: Zoom; TRO Hearing held on 11/8/2022 re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff City Beverages LLC. Court hears arguments of counsel and GRANTS the motion for Temporary Restraining Order, for the reasons stated on the record. Court directs the parties to draft an order memorializing the Court's ruling, and to file supplemental briefing on the bond issue by 11/15/2022, limiting the memos to 7 pages. (MGC)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (MGC)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DECLARATION of Christopher Hagle filed by Plaintiff City Beverages LLC re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Vaska, Michael)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DECLARATION of Shawn Bai filed by Plaintiff City Beverages LLC re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Vaska, Michael)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff City Beverages LLC, TO RESPONSE to #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Vaska, Michael)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING *Time: TRO Hearing is set for 11/8/2022 at *2:45 PM via Zoom before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (MGC)
November 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Supplemental DECLARATION of John Williams filed by Defendants Constellation Brands Inc, Crown Imports LLC re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Brain, Christopher)
November 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Supplemental DECLARATION of Christopher Brain filed by Defendants Constellation Brands Inc, Crown Imports LLC re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Brain, Christopher)
November 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE, by Defendants Constellation Brands Inc, Crown Imports LLC, to #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Oral Argument Requested. (Brain, Christopher)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Hearing re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2022 at 4:00 PM via Zoom before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (MGC)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose Motion re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; filed by Defendants Constellation Brands Inc, Crown Imports LLC. (Brain, Christopher)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECLARATION of Michael K. Vaska filed by Plaintiff City Beverages LLC re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Vaska, Michael)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Supplemental DECLARATION of Chris Hagle filed by Plaintiff City Beverages LLC re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Vaska, Michael)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff City Beverages LLC. Noting Date 11/4/2022, (Vaska, Michael)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DECLARATION of Chris Hagle filed by Plaintiff City Beverages LLC re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Marchesini, Angelo)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff City Beverages LLC, TO RESPONSE to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Marchesini, Angelo)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/11/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/18/2023, Joint Status Report due by 1/25/2023, Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/2023 at 9:30 AM via Zoom before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (MGC)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Angelo Marchesini on behalf of Plaintiff City Beverages LLC. (Marchesini, Angelo)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECLARATION of Christopher Brain filed by Defendants Constellation Brands Inc, Crown Imports LLC re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Brain, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECLARATION of Dan Levine filed by Defendants Constellation Brands Inc, Crown Imports LLC re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Brain, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DECLARATION of John Williams filed by Defendants Constellation Brands Inc, Crown Imports LLC re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Brain, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DECLARATION of Chris Steffanci filed by Defendants Constellation Brands Inc, Crown Imports LLC re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Brain, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE, by Defendants Constellation Brands Inc, Crown Imports LLC, to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Oral Argument Requested. (Brain, Christopher)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kaleigh Boyd on behalf of Defendants Constellation Brands Inc, Crown Imports LLC. (Boyd, Kaleigh)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher Ian Brain on behalf of Defendants Constellation Brands Inc, Crown Imports LLC. (Brain, Christopher)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Crown Imports LLC on 10/7/2022 (Vaska, Michael)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Constellation Brands Inc on 10/7/2022 (Vaska, Michael)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas Fitzgerald Ahearne on behalf of Plaintiff City Beverages LLC. (Ahearne, Thomas)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin J Hodges on behalf of Plaintiff City Beverages LLC. (Hodges, Benjamin)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Constellation Brands Inc, Crown Imports LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(AMD)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (AMD)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff City Beverages LLC re #5 Declaration,, #8 Declaration, #7 Declaration, #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #6 Declaration,, (Vaska, Michael)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo added. (AMD)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DECLARATION of Nick Bland filed by Plaintiff City Beverages, L.L.C., d/b/a Olympic Eagle Distributing, a Missouri limited liability company with its principal place of business in Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Vaska, Michael)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DECLARATION of Shawn Bai filed by Plaintiff City Beverages, L.L.C., d/b/a Olympic Eagle Distributing, a Missouri limited liability company with its principal place of business in Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - to Bai Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - to Bai Declaration)(Vaska, Michael)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLARATION of Chris Hagle filed by Plaintiff City Beverages, L.L.C., d/b/a Olympic Eagle Distributing, a Missouri limited liability company with its principal place of business in Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - to Hagle Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - to Hagle Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - to Hagle Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - to Hagle Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - to Hagle Declaration, #6 Exhibit F - to Hagle Declaration, #7 Exhibit G - to Hagle Declaration, #8 Exhibit H - to Hagle Declaration, #9 Exhibit I - to Hagle Declaration)(Vaska, Michael)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION of Steve Knight filed by Plaintiff City Beverages, L.L.C., d/b/a Olympic Eagle Distributing, a Missouri limited liability company with its principal place of business in Washington re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - to Knight Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - to Knight Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - to Knight Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - to Knight Declaration, #5 Exhibit E - to Knight Declaration, #6 Exhibit F - to Knight Declaration)(Vaska, Michael)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff City Beverages, L.L.C., d/b/a Olympic Eagle Distributing, a Missouri limited liability company with its principal place of business in Washington. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 10/28/2022, (Vaska, Michael)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE Notice of Filing of Summons re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff City Beverages, L.L.C., d/b/a Olympic Eagle Distributing, a Missouri limited liability company with its principal place of business in Washington. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons as to Constellation Brands)(Vaska, Michael)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE Notice of Corporate Disclosure ; filed by Plaintiff City Beverages, L.L.C., d/b/a Olympic Eagle Distributing, a Missouri limited liability company with its principal place of business in Washington. (Vaska, Michael)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-7730957), filed by City Beverages, L.L.C., d/b/a Olympic Eagle Distributing, a Missouri limited liability company with its principal place of business in Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Vaska, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City Beverages LLC v. Crown Imports LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Beverages, L.L.C., d/b/a Olympic Eagle Distributing, a Missouri limited liability company with its principal place of business in Washington
Represented By: Benjamin J Hodges
Represented By: Michael K Vaska
Represented By: Thomas Fitzgerald Ahearne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City Beverages LLC a Missouri limited liability company with its principal place of business in Washington doing business as Olympic Eagle Distributing
Represented By: Angelo Marchesini
Represented By: Benjamin J Hodges
Represented By: Michael K Vaska
Represented By: Thomas Fitzgerald Ahearne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Imports LLC, d/b/a Constellation Brands Beer Division, a Delaware corporation with its principal place of business in Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constellation Brands, Inc, a Delaware corporation with its principal place of business in New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Imports LLC a Delaware corporation with its principal place of business in Illinois doing business as Constellation Brands Beer Division
Represented By: Christopher Ian Brain
Represented By: Kaleigh Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constellation Brands Inc
Represented By: Christopher Ian Brain
Represented By: Kaleigh Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?