Quan et al v Farmers Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: ian quan and Alyssa Kuhn
Defendant: Farmers Group Inc, Fire Insurance Exchange and Abatement Services Inc
Case Number: 3:2023cv05296
Filed: April 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David G Estudillo
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2023 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #5 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint : Corrected the service date. (AMD)
May 20, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Fire Insurance Exchange on 5/19/2023, filed by Plaintiffs Alyssa Kuhn, Ian Quan. (Wagner, Joseph)
May 20, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Farmers Group, Inc. on 5/19/2023 5/16/2023, filed by Plaintiffs Alyssa Kuhn, Ian Quan. (Wagner, Joseph) Modified on 5/22/2023 (AMD).
May 20, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Abatement Services, Inc. on 5/16/2023, filed by Plaintiffs Alyssa Kuhn, Ian Quan. (Wagner, Joseph)
April 27, 2023 Filing 3 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Abatement Services Inc, Farmers Group Inc, Fire Insurance Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Fire Insurance Group, #2 Summons - ASI)(AMD)
April 27, 2023 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Alyssa Kuhn, Ian Quan (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Fire Insurance, #2 Summons Summons ASI)(Wagner, Joseph)
April 10, 2023 U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo added. (AMD)
April 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Abatement Services Inc, Farmers Group Inc, Fire Insurance Exchange with JURY DEMAND filed by Ian Quan, Alyssa Kuhn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Wagner, Joseph) (FEE PAID AWAWDC-7960613 Prepayment Waived) Modified on 4/7/2023 add fee payment information (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quan et al v Farmers Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ian quan
Represented By: Joseph Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Kuhn
Represented By: Joseph Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmers Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Insurance Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abatement Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?