Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Company et al v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Plaintiff: Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Company a/s/o Lucky Eagle Casino & Hotel, Lucky Eagle Casino & Hotel, Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Company A/S/O Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation doing business as Lucky Eagle Casino & Hotel and Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation doing business as Lucky Eagle Casino & Hotel
Defendant: Sunpengcheng / Bohanclub, Amazon.com, Inc., shen zhen shi bo han dian zi shang wu you xian gog si, Amazon.com Inc and Does 1-5
Case Number: 3:2023cv05438
Filed: May 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2023 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Hanson, Eric)
June 30, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Amazon.com Inc.(Philips, Breanna)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Parties' #9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. The deadline for Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Dkt. #3 ) shall be extended to 6/30/2023. Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (SB)
June 26, 2023 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Amazon.com Inc. (Philips, Breanna)
June 26, 2023 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , filed by Defendant Amazon.com Inc. Noting Date 6/26/2023, (Philips, Breanna)
June 26, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Breanna Philips on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (Philips, Breanna)
June 26, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William Brendan Murphy on behalf of Defendant Amazon.com Inc. (Murphy, William)
June 1, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Amazon on 5/25/2023, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Hanson, Eric)
May 24, 2023 Filing 5 Amended Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Amazon.com Inc. (SB)
May 23, 2023 Filing 4 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1(a)(2). Filed by Lucky Eagle Casino & Hotel, Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Hanson, Eric)
May 23, 2023 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Lucky Eagle Casino & Hotel. (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended Summons to Amazon)(Hanson, Eric)
May 18, 2023 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/25/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(CDA)
May 15, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Amazon.com Inc. (AMD)
May 15, 2023 Judge John H. Chun added. (AMD)
May 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Amazon.com, Inc., Sunpengcheng / Bohanclub (Receipt # AWAWDC-8007688) filed by Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Company a/s/o Lucky Eagle Casino & Hotel, Lucky Eagle Casino & Hotel. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanson, Eric) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/12/2023 due to malformed doc) (AMD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Company et al v. Amazon.com Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunpengcheng / Bohanclub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shen zhen shi bo han dian zi shang wu you xian gog si
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc
Represented By: Breanna Philips
Represented By: William Brendan Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Company a/s/o Lucky Eagle Casino & Hotel
Represented By: Eric Charles Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucky Eagle Casino & Hotel
Represented By: Eric Charles Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Company A/S/O Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation doing business as Lucky Eagle Casino & Hotel
Represented By: Eric Charles Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation doing business as Lucky Eagle Casino & Hotel
Represented By: Eric Charles Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?