Weldeyohannes v. State of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Mussie E Weldeyohannes
Defendant: State of Washington, Washington Corrections Center, John Lee, Olson-Ward, Veres and Unknown Officers
Case Number: 3:2023cv05526
Filed: June 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint no later than August 31, 2023.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Mussie Weldeyohannes, Prisoner ID: 362245) (CR)
July 14, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Plaintiff Mussie E Weldeyohannes. Noting Date 7/21/2023, **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Mussie Weldeyohannes, Prisoner ID: 362245) (CR)
July 14, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2023, **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Mussie Weldeyohannes, Prisoner ID: 362245) (CR)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DECLINING SERVICE #6 AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. The Court declines to serve Plaintiffs complaint.Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint no later than July 27, 2023 (Attachments: #1 Blank 1983 Form)**12 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Mussie Weldeyohannes, Prisoner ID: 362245) (CR)
July 6, 2023 Filing 6 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Mussie E Weldeyohannes against defendant(s) John Lee, Olson-Ward, State of Washington, Unknown Officers, Veres, Washington Corrections Center with JURY DEMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**58 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Mussie Weldeyohannes, Prisoner ID: 362245) (CR)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance)**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Mussie Weldeyohannes, Prisoner ID: 362245) (CR)
July 6, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 7/27/2023, **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Mussie Weldeyohannes, Prisoner ID: 362245) (CR)
June 16, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Brian A Tsuchida filed by Mussie E Weldeyohannes. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 PROPOSED Application to Proceed Without Costs - EDWA, #3 Exhibit, #4 Prison Trust Account Statement)**64 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Mussie Weldeyohannes, Prisoner ID: 362245) (CR)
June 16, 2023 Deficiency corrected. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Mussie Weldeyohannes, Prisoner ID: 362245) (CR)
June 12, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Application,. ***Action Required*** Incorrect IFP Form.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 7/12/2023 to correct IFP application (Attachments: #1 Blank IFP Form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Mussie Weldeyohannes, Prisoner ID: 362245) (CR)
June 9, 2023 Filing 1 APPLICATION To Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Mussie E Weldeyohannes. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 PROPOSED Application to Proceed Without Costs - EDWA, #3 Exhibit, #4 Prison Trust Account Statement)**63 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Mussie Weldeyohannes, Prisoner ID: 362245) (CR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weldeyohannes v. State of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mussie E Weldeyohannes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Corrections Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olson-Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?