Ragland v. Bennett
Petitioner: John Benton Ragland
Respondent: Jason Bennett
Case Number: 3:2023cv05574
Filed: June 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Referring Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Order Directing Service, , filed by Respondent Jason Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/25/2023, **PRINT ALL**(John Ragland, Prisoner ID: 356380)(Fowler, Christopher)
July 10, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher Mark Fowler on behalf of Respondent Jason Bennett. **PRINT ALL**(John Ragland, Prisoner ID: 356380)(Fowler, Christopher)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE #1 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Documents served electronically to Jason Bennett; Attorney General of the State of Washington on 6/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Prisoner Instructions - Mandatory E- Filer (PEF))**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Ragland, Prisoner ID: 356380) (CR)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING #3 PETITIONERS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Ragland, Prisoner ID: 356380) (CR)
June 28, 2023 Filing 4 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(John Ragland, Prisoner ID: 356380) (CR)
June 28, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Petition for Relief from a Conviction or Sentence by a Person in State Custody (Petion under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus), filed by Petitioner John Benton Ragland. Noting Date 7/14/2023, **5 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Ragland, Prisoner ID: 356380) (CR)
June 28, 2023 Filing 1 2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # 200002368) filed by John Benton Ragland. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application (Fee already received), #2 Prison Trust Account Statement)**35 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(John Ragland, Prisoner ID: 356380) (CR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ragland v. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Benton Ragland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jason Bennett
Represented By: Christopher Mark Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?