Cummings v. NewRez LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kristine A Cummings
Defendant: NewRez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Case Number: 3:2023cv05590
Filed: July 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gregor A. Hensrude on behalf of Defendant NewRez LLC. (Hensrude, Gregor)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 8/28/2023, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/14/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/21/2023. (LC)
July 3, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant NewRez LLC. (AMD)
July 3, 2023 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (AMD)
July 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # BWAWDC-8072326) Attorney John A Cochran added to party Kristine Cummings(pty:pla) filed by Kristine Cummings. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cochran, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cummings v. NewRez LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine A Cummings
Represented By: John A Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Gregor A. Hensrude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?