Chan v. Grubhub Holdings Inc
Plaintiff: Joshua Ah Chan
Defendant: Grubhub Holdings Inc
Case Number: 3:2023cv05744
Filed: August 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Joshua Ah Chan, to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Partial. (DeLue, Daniel)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Partial. Filed by Defendant Grubhub Holdings Inc. Noting Date 10/27/2023, (Corneil, David)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1(a)(2). Filed by Grubhub Holdings Inc. (Corneil, David)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Just Eat Takeaway.com N.V for Grubhub Holdings Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Grubhub Holdings Inc. (Corneil, David)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Noting Date Set/Reset re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Partial : Noting Date 9/22/2023. (MW)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : Partial, filed by Defendant Grubhub Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/27/2023 9/22/2023 8/28/2023, (Corneil, David) Modified on 8/28/2023 (MW). Modified on 8/29/2023 (MW).
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David Corneil on behalf of Defendant Grubhub Holdings Inc. (Corneil, David)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/6/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/13/2023, Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2023. (MET)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Kitsap County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MW)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (MW)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/28/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(MW)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kitsap County Superior Court, case number Case No. 22-2-01584-18; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8130385) filed by GRUBHUB HOLDINGS INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Amended Superior Court Complaint Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Erfle, Nancy) Modified on 8/21/2023 (MW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chan v. Grubhub Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Ah Chan
Represented By: Jessica M Jetter
Represented By: David A Roberts
Represented By: Daniel D DeLue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grubhub Holdings Inc
Represented By: Nancy M Erfle
Represented By: David Corneil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?