Neville v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: William Michael Neville
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2023cv05801
Filed: September 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erin Highland on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Highland, Erin)
September 8, 2023 Filing 4 Notice: Pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), Rule 3. Service, the Court hereby notifies the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of Washington of the commencement of this action by transmitting to them this docket entry via Notice of Electronic Filing. If Plaintiff is proceeding pro se and is not registered to receive electronic notice of filings, this Notice will be delivered to plaintiff via U.S. mail. Per Rule 3, "the plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4." (SB)
September 8, 2023 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Commissioner of Social Security (IFP Granted) filed by William Michael Neville. (SB)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Defendant shall file a certified copy of the Administrative Record and any affirmative defenses within 60 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SB)
September 7, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by William Neville. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oliver, David) (Attachment 2 replaced due to malformed pdf on 9/7/2023) (TE).
September 7, 2023 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (TE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neville v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Michael Neville
Represented By: David P Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US Attorney Social Security
Represented By: Erin Highland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?