Brabham et al v. Grand Design RV LLC
Plaintiff: Stephen Leroy Brabham, LazyDays RV of Oregon, LLC and Julie Arlene Brabham
Defendant: Grand Design RV, LLC, Grand Design RV LLC and LazyDays RV of Oregon LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv05909
Filed: October 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David G Estudillo
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Benjamin R Winkelman for All Plaintiffs. (Winkelman, Benjamin)
November 20, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan Matthew Pesicka on behalf of Plaintiffs Julie Arlene Brabham, Stephen Leroy Brabham. (Pesicka, Ryan)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Stipulated MOTION. It is ORDERED that the time for filing an Answer by Grand Design RV LLC and LazyDays RV of Oregon LLC is hereby extended to 11/13/2023. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo.(AMD)
October 30, 2023 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION and Order Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint, filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 10/30/2023, (Nelson, Tamara)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/11/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/18/2024, Joint Status Report due by 1/25/2024, Scheduling Conference set for 2/2/2024 at 4:00 PM via Zoom before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (MGC)
October 24, 2023 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. (AQ)
October 23, 2023 Filing 12 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service, #2 Exhibit Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service, #3 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal with Attachments)(Nelson, Tamara)
October 19, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin R Winkelman on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Leroy Brabham. (Winkelman, Benjamin)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida, re #7 Agreed Stipulated MOTION and Order Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint. Answer by Grand Design RV, LLC and Lazydays RV of Oregon, LLC is hereby extended to 10/30/2023. (SNP)
October 18, 2023 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent LDRV Holdings Corp for LazyDays RV of Oregon LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by LazyDays RV of Oregon LLC. (Nelson, Tamara)
October 18, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Peter Steilberg on behalf of Defendant LazyDays RV of Oregon LLC. (Steilberg, Peter)
October 16, 2023 Filing 7 Agreed Stipulated MOTION and Order Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint, filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 10/16/2023, (Nelson, Tamara)
October 12, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. ***Action Required*** Attorney Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (AMD)
October 11, 2023 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Cowlitz County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (AMD)
October 11, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/18/2023. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ) Modified on 10/13/2023 - Docket entry stricken and consent deadline terminated due to #6 Plaintiff attorney admission deficiency (AQ). Modified on 10/24/2023 - At Court's direction, consent letter reinstated. (AQ).
October 11, 2023 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (AMD)
October 11, 2023 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendant LazyDays RV of Oregon LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/18/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(AMD)
October 10, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Octavius, Other Affiliate Winnebago Industries, Inc. for Grand Design RV, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Grand Design RV, LLC. (Nelson, Tamara)
October 9, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Grand Design RV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Removal Pleadings)(Nelson, Tamara)
October 9, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cowlitz County Superior Court, case number 23-2-00813-08; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8194751) filed by Grand Design RV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit docket, #3 Exhibit Notice of Appearance - State, #4 Exhibit Notice of State Court Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Tamara) (Attachment 5 replaced on 10/10/2023 due to malformed doc) (AMD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brabham et al v. Grand Design RV LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Leroy Brabham
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Pesicka
Represented By: Benjamin R Winkelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LazyDays RV of Oregon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Arlene Brabham
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Pesicka
Represented By: Benjamin R Winkelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Design RV, LLC
Represented By: Peter Steilberg
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Pesicka
Represented By: Tamara Kristine Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Design RV LLC
Represented By: Peter Steilberg
Represented By: Tamara Kristine Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LazyDays RV of Oregon LLC
Represented By: Robert R Gillanders
Represented By: Peter Steilberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?