Dickens v. NaphCare
Plaintiff: Joshua A Dickens
Defendant: NaphCare
Case Number: 3:2023cv05934
Filed: October 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: David G Estudillo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE, GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND, AND DENYING #7 MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint no later than 12/18/2023. Signed by Judge David W. Christel.(MW) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS w/ blank 1983 form)
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Joshua A Dickens. Noted by Clerk for 12/1/2023. (MW)
November 16, 2023 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) NaphCare (Receipt # IFP Granted) filed by Joshua A Dickens.(MW)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS. Signed by Judge David W. Christel. (MW)(cc: Plaintiff, Kitsap County Jail, WAWD Finance)
November 2, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis referred to Judge David W. Christel, filed by Joshua A Dickens. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account, #3 Proposed Motion to Appoint Counsel)(TE)
October 19, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Application. ***Action Required*** Incorrect IFP Form.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 11/20/2023 to correct IFP application (MW) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS w/ blank IFP form)
October 18, 2023 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Joshua A Dickens. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Proposed Complaint, #3 Proposed Motion to Appoint Counsel)(MW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickens v. NaphCare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua A Dickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NaphCare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?