Wolfclan v. Menesses et al
Plaintiff: Justin Allen Davey and Echota Wolfclan
Defendant: Jilma Menesses, Charles Sutherlin, Cassi Villegas and State of Washington
Case Number: 3:2023cv05938
Filed: October 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Referring Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Documents served electronically to Jilma Menesses; Charles Sutherlin; Cassie Villegas; State of Washington on 12/11/2023. Plaintiff recently submitted a proposed motion for summary judgment (dkt. # 9-3) and a proposed motion to add defendants (dkt. # 9-4). Plaintiffs proposed motion for summary judgment (dkt. # 9-3) is STRICKEN as premature given that Defendants have yet to be served in this matter. Plaintiff may re-file his motion at a later date after Defendants have appeared and the parties have had an opportunity to conduct any necessary discovery. Plaintiffs proposed motion to add defendants (dkt. # 9-4) is DENIED as it is procedurally deficient. The appropriate mechanism for Plaintiff to add defendants is for him to file an amended pleading that incorporates all of his intended claims against all intended defendants. (cc: Order and courtesy copy of Plaintiff's complaint to Washington Attorney General's Office via USPS) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Echota Wolfclan, Prisoner ID: 311532) (CR)
December 8, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Add Defendants, filed by Plaintiff Echota Wolfclan. Noting Date 12/22/2023, **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Echota Wolfclan, Prisoner ID: 311532) (CR)
December 8, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Echota Wolfclan. Noting Date 12/22/2023, **8 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Echota Wolfclan, Prisoner ID: 311532) (CR)
December 8, 2023 Filing 11 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Echota Wolfclan against defendant(s) Jilma Menesses, State of Washington, Charles Sutherlin, Cassi Villegas with JURY DEMAND **30 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Echota Wolfclan, Prisoner ID: 311532) (CR)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Echota Wolfclan, Prisoner ID: 311532) (CR)
December 7, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L. Peterson filed by Echota Wolfclan. (Attachments: #1 Trust Account Statement, #2 Proposed Complaint, #3 Proposed Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Proposed Motion to Add Defendants)**46 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Echota Wolfclan, Prisoner ID: 311532)(MW)
November 29, 2023 Filing 8 PROPOSED Motion to Add Defendants filed by Plaintiff Echota Wolfclan **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Echota Wolfclan, Prisoner ID: 311532) (CR)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 PROPOSED Motion for Summary Judgment Rule 56 filed by Plaintiff Echota Wolfclan **8 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Echota Wolfclan, Prisoner ID: 311532) (CR)
November 27, 2023 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L. Peterson. ***Action Required*** Prison Trust Account Statement.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 12/27/2023 to correct IFP application **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Echota Wolfclan, Prisoner ID: 311532) (CR)
November 14, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name Filed by Plaintiff Echota Wolfclan. Address updated to Washington Corrections Center. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Echota Wolfclan, Prisoner ID: 311532) (CR)
November 1, 2023 Filing 4 PROPOSED Motion to Show Cause to Correct Name filed by Plaintiff Justin Allen Davey (CR)
October 23, 2023 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (CR)
October 19, 2023 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Justin Allen Davey before Judge Michelle L. Peterson (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Letter Regarding Prison Trust Account Statement) (CR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfclan v. Menesses et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Allen Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Echota Wolfclan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jilma Menesses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Sutherlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassi Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?