Tucker v. Olympic Corrections Center et al
Plaintiff: Trevon Niko Tucker
Defendant: Olympic Corrections Center and Staviek
Case Number: 3:2023cv06013
Filed: November 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Referring Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2023 Plaintiff address updated to Washington Corrections Center per notice from Washington State Department of Corrections. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Trevon Tucker, Prisoner ID: 366477) (CR)
December 21, 2023 Filing 7 AMENDED 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Trevon Niko Tucker against defendant(s) Staviek. **12 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Trevon Tucker, Prisoner ID: 366477) (CR)
December 21, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER: re #7 Amended Complaint. RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Olympic Corrections Center. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Trevon Tucker, Prisoner ID: 366477) (CR)
December 12, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2024, **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Trevon Tucker, Prisoner ID: 366477) (CR)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DECLINING #5 SERVICE AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend his complaint, if possible, to correct the identified deficiency. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff may submit an amended complaint that corrects the deficiency outlined above. The amended complaint must be filed under the same case number as this one, and will operate as a complete substitute for, rather than a mere supplement to, the present complaint. See Ferdik v. Bonzelet, 963 F.2d 1258, 1262 (9th Cir. 1992). If no amended complaint is timely filed, or if Plaintiff files an amended complaint that fails to correct the deficiency identified above, the Court may recommend that this matter be dismissed. (Attachments: #1 Blank 1983 Form)**13 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Trevon Tucker, Prisoner ID: 366477) (CR)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Trevon Niko Tucker against defendant(s) Olympic Corrections Center, Staviek **11 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Trevon Tucker, Prisoner ID: 366477) (CR)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance)**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Trevon Tucker, Prisoner ID: 366477) (CR)
November 20, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Trevon Niko Tucker before Judge S. Kate Vaughan (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement)**16 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Trevon Tucker, Prisoner ID: 366477) (CR)
November 20, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge S. Kate Vaughan. RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Olympic Corrections Center. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Trevon Tucker, Prisoner ID: 366477) (CR)
November 20, 2023 Deficiency corrected. Prison Trust Account Statement received. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Trevon Tucker, Prisoner ID: 366477) (CR)
November 7, 2023 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Application,. ***Action Required*** Prison Trust Account Statement.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 12/7/2023 to correct IFP application **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Trevon Tucker, Prisoner ID: 366477) (CR)
November 7, 2023 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Application,. RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Olympic Corrections Center. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Trevon Tucker, Prisoner ID: 366477) (CR)
November 6, 2023 Filing 1 APPLICATION To Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Trevon Niko Tucker. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)**14 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Trevon Tucker, Prisoner ID: 366477) (CR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Olympic Corrections Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevon Niko Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympic Corrections Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staviek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?