O'Donahue v. Tuugiiboss Trans Inc et al
Plaintiff: Michael A O'Donahue
Defendant: Tuugiiboss Trans Inc, Batzaya Sukhee, John/Jane Doe Sukhee, Does I-V and Roes Corporations VI-X
Case Number: 3:2023cv06028
Filed: November 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Grady J Leupold
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2024 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Alayna L. Nicholes filed by All Defendants re #12 MOTION to Remand (Nicholes, Alayna)
January 2, 2024 Filing 13 RESPONSE, by All Defendants, to #12 MOTION to Remand . (Nicholes, Alayna)
December 11, 2023 Noting Date Set/Reset re #12 MOTION to Remand: Noting Date 1/5/2024. (MW)
December 8, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Michael A O'Donahue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration In Support of Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2) Noting Date 1/5/2024 12/8/2023, (Strong, Jedediah) Modified on 12/11/2023 (MW).
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 1/9/2024, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/19/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/2/2024, by Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold. (KAM) Modified on 11/28/2023 (cc: Atty Barnett via US Mail) (KAM).
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold. (KAM) Modified on 11/28/2023 (cc: Atty Barnett via US Mail) (KAM).
November 28, 2023 Filing 9 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KAM) Modified on 11/29/2023 (cc: Atty Barnett via US Mail) (KAM).
November 27, 2023 Filing 8 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by All Defendants (Nicholes, Alayna)
November 13, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/20/2023. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
November 9, 2023 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET; filed by All Defendants. (Nicholes, Alayna)
November 9, 2023 Filing 5 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,. ***Action Required*** Civil Cover Sheet Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MW)
November 9, 2023 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MW)
November 9, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Tuugiiboss Trans Inc. for Tuugiiboss Trans Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Tuugiiboss Trans Inc.. (Nicholes, Alayna)
November 9, 2023 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by All Defendants (Nicholes, Alayna)
November 9, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 23-2-09229-1; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8235847) Attorney Alayna Lyn Nicholes added to party Batzaya Sukhee(pty:dft), Attorney Alayna Lyn Nicholes added to party Tuugiiboss Trans Inc.(pty:dft) filed by Batzaya Sukhee, Tuugiiboss Trans Inc..(Nicholes, Alayna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2023: #1 State Court Complaint) (MW).
November 9, 2023 Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold added. (MW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Donahue v. Tuugiiboss Trans Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A O'Donahue
Represented By: Peter Roy Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuugiiboss Trans Inc
Represented By: Alayna Lyn Nicholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Batzaya Sukhee
Represented By: Alayna Lyn Nicholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe Sukhee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does I-V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roes Corporations VI-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?