Walz v. Walmart Inc et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Walz
Defendant: Walmart Inc, Delivery Drivers Inc and Ashley Hatfield
Case Number: 3:2023cv06083
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Cassie Cook filed by Defendants Ashley Hatfield, Walmart Inc re #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pankratz, Adam)
January 12, 2024 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Alonzo Cardenas filed by Defendants Ashley Hatfield, Walmart Inc re #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Pankratz, Adam)
January 12, 2024 Filing 20 REPLY, filed by Defendants Ashley Hatfield, Walmart Inc, TO RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Pankratz, Adam)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christopher Q Davis PLAINTIFF for Joshua Walz, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
January 8, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE, by All Plaintiffs, to #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pizl, James Abbasi, Justin) Modified on 1/9/2024 (AMD).
January 8, 2024 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher Q. Davis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Joshua Walz (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8304711 (Abbasi, Justin)
January 5, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rowan Laidlaw on behalf of Plaintiff Joshua Walz. (Laidlaw, Rowan)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/20/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/27/2024, Joint Status Report due by 3/5/2024. (MET)
December 5, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. (AQ)
December 4, 2023 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Ashley O'Brien filed by Defendants Ashley Hatfield, Walmart Inc re #12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pankratz, Adam)
December 4, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, filed by Defendants Ashley Hatfield, Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/12/2024, (Pankratz, Adam)
December 4, 2023 Filing 11 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Walmart Inc. (Pankratz, Adam)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Scott Voelz for DEFENDANT Walmart Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jamie Butts for DEFENDANT Walmart Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Allison Bader for DEFENDANT Walmart Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Scott Voelz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Walmart Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8258889 (Pankratz, Adam)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jamie Butts FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Walmart Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8258876 (Pankratz, Adam)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Allison Bader FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Walmart Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8258774 (Pankratz, Adam)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Attorney Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (AMD)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (AMD)
November 28, 2023 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (AMD)
November 28, 2023 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendant Walmart Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/5/2023. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(AMD)
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Adam T. Pankratz re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Pankratz, Adam)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 23-2-10696-8; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8255012) filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pankratz, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walz v. Walmart Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Walz
Represented By: James Brian Pizl
Represented By: Justin O Abbasi
Represented By: Christopher Q Davis
Represented By: Rowan Laidlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Adam T Pankratz
Represented By: Allison Bader
Represented By: Jamie Butts
Represented By: Scott Voelz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delivery Drivers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Hatfield
Represented By: Adam T Pankratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?