Church of the Gardens et al v. Quality Loan Services Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Church of the Gardens and Alvin White
Defendant: Quality Loan Services Corporation of Washington, MTC Financial Inc doing business as Trustee Corps, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-4, Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-5 and State of Washington
Case Number: 3:2023cv06193
Filed: December 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tiffany M Cartwright
Referring Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2024 Filing 38 REPLY, filed by All Plaintiffs, TO RESPONSE to #19 CROSS MOTION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Stafne, Scott)
February 21, 2024 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Scott Stafne In Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Trustee Corps Response to Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs re #19 CROSS MOTION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Stafne, Scott)
February 21, 2024 Filing 36 REPLY, filed by All Plaintiffs, TO RESPONSE to #19 CROSS MOTION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Stafne, Scott)
February 21, 2024 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Scott Stafne In Response to Motion to Continue filed by All Plaintiffs re #26 MOTION to Continue Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment (Stafne, Scott)
February 21, 2024 Filing 34 RESPONSE by All Plaintiffs re #17 Declaration (non motion) Objection and Answer to Declaration of Non-Monetary Statuts (Stafne, Scott)
February 20, 2024 Filing 33 RESPONSE, by Defendant MTC Financial Inc, to #19 CROSS MOTION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (DeLeo, Michael)
February 20, 2024 Filing 32 RESPONSE, by Defendant State of Washington, to #19 CROSS MOTION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order DENYING PLAINTIFFS CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Smith-Levy, Sarah)
February 15, 2024 Filing 31 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #26 MOTION to Continue Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, #29 MOTION for Relief from Deadline, by Defendant Quality Loan Services Corporation of Washington. (McDonald, Robert)
February 15, 2024 Filing 30 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Quality Loan Services Corporation of Washington.(McDonald, Robert)
February 15, 2024 Filing 29 MOTION for Relief from Deadline, filed by Defendants Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-4, Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-5. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/23/2024, (Sagara, Midori)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO RESTORE PLEADING. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion (Dkt. #16 ) and directs the Clerk's office to restore Dkt. #4 as it was originally filed. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright.(AMD)
February 15, 2024 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Midori Sagara filed by Defendants Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-4, Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-5 re #26 MOTION to Continue Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Sagara, Midori)
February 15, 2024 Filing 26 MOTION to Continue Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-4, Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-5. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/23/2024, (Sagara, Midori)
February 2, 2024 Filing 25 REPLY, filed by Defendant State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Smith-Levy, Sarah)
January 30, 2024 Filing 24 PRAECIPE to attach document (Compliant Signature) re #20 Declaration by All Plaintiffs (Stafne, Scott)
January 30, 2024 Filing 23 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #20 Declaration. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (AMD)
January 29, 2024 Filing 22 REQUEST for Judicial Notice by All Plaintiffs for Judicial Notice re #18 Response to Motion, #19 CROSS MOTION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stafne, Scott)
January 29, 2024 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Scott E. Stafne filed by All Plaintiffs re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #19 CROSS MOTION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stafne, Scott)
January 29, 2024 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Alvin White filed by All Plaintiffs re #19 CROSS MOTION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Stafne, Scott)
January 29, 2024 Filing 19 CROSS MOTION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/23/2024, (Stafne, Scott)
January 29, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE, by All Plaintiffs, to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Stafne, Scott)
January 19, 2024 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Non-Monetary Status by Defendant MTC Financial Inc (DeLeo, Michael)
January 17, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION Restore Plaintiffs pleading denominated as Notice and Objection to Assignment of Magistrate Judge re #4 Notice-Other, , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott Stafne) Noting Date 2/2/2024, (Stafne, Scott)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/2/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/9/2024, Joint Status Report due by 4/16/2024. (MET)
January 16, 2024 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright for all further proceedings. Hon. S. Kate Vaughan no longer assigned to case. (SNP)
January 16, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 1/23/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (SNP)
January 11, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , filed by Defendant State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/2/2024, (Smith-Levy, Sarah)
January 9, 2024 Filing 11 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by All Plaintiffs (Stafne, Scott)
January 9, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by MTC Financial Inc. (DeLeo, Michael)
January 9, 2024 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank AG, a corporation organized under the laws of the Federal Republic of Germany for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Sagara, Midori)
January 8, 2024 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Alvin White, Church of the Gardens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-18)(Stafne, Scott)
January 5, 2024 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Quality Loan Services Corporation of Washington. (McDonald, Robert)
January 4, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah Elizabeth Smith-Levy on behalf of Defendant State of Washington. (Smith-Levy, Sarah)
January 4, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney R July Simpson on behalf of Defendant State of Washington. (Simpson, R)
January 4, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE and Objection to assignment of Magistrate Judge re Add and Terminate Judges ; filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stafne, Scott) Modified on 1/4/2024 - STRICKEN at the direction of Chambers as improper for failure to follow procedures as governed by General Order 01-15. (SNP) Modified on 2/15/2024 to restore docket entry per #28 Order (AMD).
January 3, 2024 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Church of the Gardens, Quality Loan Services Corp of Washington, MTC Financial Inc and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/10/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(CDA)
December 28, 2023 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MW)
December 28, 2023 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Attachments: #1 State court pleadings)(Sagara, Midori)
December 28, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 23-2-11864-8; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8294778) filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Sagara, Midori) (Attachment 1 replaced due to malformed pdf on 12/28/2023) (MW).
December 28, 2023 Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (MW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church of the Gardens et al v. Quality Loan Services Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church of the Gardens
Represented By: Scott E Stafne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin White
Represented By: Scott E Stafne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Services Corporation of Washington
Represented By: Robert William McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial Inc doing business as Trustee Corps
Represented By: Michael Steven DeLeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Midori R Sagara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Represented By: R July Simpson
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Smith-Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?