Stites v. Strange et al
Plaintiff: Jeremie David Stites
Defendant: Cheryl Strange and Joyce Lingle
Case Number: 3:2024cv05027
Filed: January 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting #12 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order (TRO) and preliminary injunction (Dkt. #6 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Jeremie Stites, Prisoner ID: 336137) (KRA)
January 30, 2024 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jeremie David Stites. Plaintiff has not established a TRO or preliminary injunction is appropriate at this stage and therefore, plaintiff's motion (Dkt. #6 ) should be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 2/13/2024. Noting Date 2/16/2024. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) **10 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Jeremie Stites, Prisoner ID: 336137) (KRA)
January 30, 2024 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Joyce Lingle mailed on 1/23/2024 **PRINT ALL**(Jeremie Stites, Prisoner ID: 336137)(Mac, Alicia)
January 30, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Cheryl Strange mailed on 1/23/2024 **PRINT ALL**(Jeremie Stites, Prisoner ID: 336137)(Mac, Alicia)
January 30, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alicia Mac on behalf of Defendants Joyce Lingle, Cheryl Strange. **PRINT ALL**(Jeremie Stites, Prisoner ID: 336137)(Mac, Alicia)
January 22, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; filed by Plaintiff Jeremie David Stites. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Jeremie Stites, Prisoner ID: 336137) (KRA)
January 22, 2024 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Jeremie Stites re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Jeremie Stites, Prisoner ID: 336137) (KRA)
January 22, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff Jeremie David Stites. Noted by clerk for 1/22/2024. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Jeremie Stites, Prisoner ID: 336137) (KRA)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Served by First-Class Mail on 1/23/24 to Cheryl Strange; Joyce Lingle. (cc: Courtesy copy of complaint to Washington State Attorney General via email) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jeremie Stites, Prisoner ID: 336137) (CR)
January 22, 2024 Filing 4 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Jeremie David Stites against defendant(s) Joyce Lingle, Cheryl Strange with JURY DEMAND **56 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jeremie Stites, Prisoner ID: 336137) (CR)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jeremie Stites, Prisoner ID: 336137) (CR)
January 9, 2024 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jeremie Stites, Prisoner ID: 336137) (CR)
January 9, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Jeremie David Stites before Judge Brian A Tsuchida (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement)**60 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Jeremie Stites, Prisoner ID: 336137) (CR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stites v. Strange et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremie David Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Strange
Represented By: Alicia Mac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Lingle
Represented By: Alicia Mac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?