B. et al v. CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence B. and L.B.
Defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Cigna Behavioral Health, Far Bank Enterprises and Sage Manufacturing Flexible Benefits Plan
Case Number: 3:2024cv05030
Filed: January 10, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David G Estudillo
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 29, 2024 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Far Bank Enterprises, Sage Manufacturing Flexible Benefits Plan.(Scharer, Karleen)
February 9, 2024 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cigna Behavioral Health, Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company.(Roundtree, Al)
February 8, 2024 Attorney Davis B Leigh added for Far Bank Enterprises, Sage Manufacturing Flexible Benefits Plan; per #25 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael H. Bernstein for DEFENDANTS Cigna Behavioral Health and Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
February 6, 2024 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Karleen Joy Scharer on behalf of Defendants Far Bank Enterprises, Sage Manufacturing Flexible Benefits Plan. (Scharer, Karleen)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Katherine M Katchen for DEFENDANTS Cigna Behavioral Health and Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
February 2, 2024 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #22 by attorney Michael H. Bernstein will not be processed at this time. Attorney must first complete all requirements for PHV admission via PACER. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or #WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (MG)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/17/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/24/2024, Joint Status Report due by 5/1/2024, Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2024 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom B via Zoom before U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. Signed by U.S. District Judge David G. Estudillo. (MGC)
January 31, 2024 Filing 22 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael H. Bernstein FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Cigna Behavioral Health, Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8334402 (Roundtree, Al)
January 31, 2024 Filing 21 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Katherine M. Katchen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Cigna Behavioral Health, Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. BWAWDC-8334388 (Roundtree, Al)
January 31, 2024 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Al Roundtree on behalf of Defendants Cigna Behavioral Health, Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Roundtree, Al)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian Smith King for PLAINTIFFS Lawrence B.,Brian Smith King for L.B., by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
January 11, 2024 Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian S. King FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Lawrence B., L.B. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8309048 (Casciari, Marie)
January 11, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marie Casciari on behalf of Plaintiffs Lawrence B., L.B.. (Casciari, Marie)
January 10, 2024 Filing 16 LETTER from Clerk to counsel regarding the following: receipt of case from the Southern District of Utah; WA/WD case number and judge assignment; and information regarding future notice and LCR 83.1(d)(1) which requires association with local counsel and instructions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (AMD)
January 10, 2024 Filing 15 Case transferred in from the District of Utah, Case Number 4:23-cv-00068. (AMD)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Change Venue. The Clerk shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler on 1/10/2024. (mh) [Transferred from utd on 1/10/2024.]
January 10, 2024 U.S. District Judge David G Estudillo added. (AMD)
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul Kohler under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate Judge to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 1/9/2024. (mjm) [Transferred from utd on 1/10/2024.]
January 8, 2024 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION to Change Venue : Stipulated Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) filed by Defendants CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company, Cigna Behavioral Health. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernstein, Michael) [Transferred from utd on 1/10/2024.]
January 8, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Lee on behalf of Far Bank Enterprises (Lee, Jacob) [Transferred from utd on 1/10/2024.]
January 8, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter H. Donaldson on behalf of Far Bank Enterprises (Donaldson, Peter) [Transferred from utd on 1/10/2024.]
November 20, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lawrence B., L. B. as to CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company Waiver sent on 11/8/2023, answer due 1/8/2024. (King, Brian) [Transferred from utd on 1/10/2024.]
November 20, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lawrence B., L. B. as to Cigna Behavioral Health Waiver sent on 11/8/2023, answer due 1/8/2024. (King, Brian) [Transferred from utd on 1/10/2024.]
November 15, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice emailed to attorney David R. Ebel for Far Bank Enterprises and Sage Manufacturing Flexible Benefits Plan. (mh) [Transferred from utd on 1/10/2024.]
November 15, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lawrence B., L. B. as to Sage Manufacturing Flexible Benefits Plan Waiver sent on 10/27/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (King, Brian) [Transferred from utd on 1/10/2024.]
November 15, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lawrence B., L. B. as to Far Bank Enterprises Waiver sent on 10/27/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (King, Brian) [Transferred from utd on 1/10/2024.]
September 22, 2023 Filing 4 RECEIVED Magistrate Availability Form from Plaintiffs L. B. and Lawrence B.. (mh) Modified by correcting file date on 9/25/2023 (mh). [Transferred from utd on 1/10/2024.]
September 1, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY TO PRESIDE OVER CASE- Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, and DUCivR 72-4, you are hereby notified that a magistrate judge for the District of Utah may conduct any or all proceedings in this case, including a jury or bench trial and entry of a final judgment. Exercise of this jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is permitted only if all parties voluntarily sign and return the form. To consent, return the Consent Form to the clerk's office within 21 days via email at consents@utd.uscourts.gov or mail at the address on the form. Please do not efile the Consent Form in the case. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs L. B., Lawrence B.. Form due by 9/22/2023. (haa) [Transferred from utd on 1/10/2024.]
September 1, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE FROM THE COURT re #1 Complaint. Attorney selected the incorrect division when creating the case. Case 2:23-cv-00592 will be closed and all pleadings will be transferred to case 4:23-cv-00068. Case number will now read 4:23-cv-00068. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (haa) [Transferred from utd on 1/10/2024.]
September 1, 2023 Judge Robert J. Shelby added. Case number will now read 4:23-cv-00068-RJS. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (haa) [Transferred from utd on 1/10/2024.]
August 31, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4797304) filed by Lawrence B., L. B.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet for new case) (King, Brian) [Transferred from utd on 1/10/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B. et al v. CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence B.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Brian Smith King
Represented By: Samuel Martin Hall
Represented By: Marie Casciari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.B.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian Smith King
Represented By: Samuel Martin Hall
Represented By: Marie Casciari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael H. Bernstein
Represented By: Katherine M Katchen
Represented By: Al Roundtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Behavioral Health
Represented By: Michael H. Bernstein
Represented By: Katherine M Katchen
Represented By: Al Roundtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Far Bank Enterprises
Represented By: Jacob Lee
Represented By: PRO HAC VICE PENDING
Represented By: Peter H Donaldson
Represented By: Davis B Leigh
Represented By: Karleen Joy Scharer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sage Manufacturing Flexible Benefits Plan
Represented By: Davis B Leigh
Represented By: Karleen Joy Scharer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?