Adams v. Lanum et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Scott Adams
Defendant: Bruce Lanum, Adam Clarino, Tony Donnington and Washington Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2024cv05034
Filed: January 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Referring Judge: Kymberly K Evanson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2024 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Adam Clarino, Tony Donnington, Bruce Lanum, Washington Department of Corrections with JURY DEMAND filed by Ryan Scott Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Exhibits, #3 Exhibits)**186 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)(MW)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE COMPLAINT. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to adequately address the issues raised herein on or before 3/10/2024, the undersigned will recommend dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge David W. Christel. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Instruction Sheet, #2 1983 Form)**24 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)(MW)
February 7, 2024 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Adam Clarino, Tony Donnington, Bruce Lanum (Receipt # IFP Granted) filed by Ryan Scott Adams.**13 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)(MW)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Judge David W. Christel. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)(MW) (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance, Washington State Penitentiary)
February 2, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge David W. Christel filed by Ryan Scott Adams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint)**17 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)(MW)
January 22, 2024 Filing 4 LETTER re #2 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter, filed by Ryan Scott Adams. **6 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)(MW)
January 22, 2024 NOTICE TO FILER: re #4 Letter. RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Washington State Penitentiary. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)(MW)
January 16, 2024 Filing 3 Mail addressed to Ryan Scott Adams returned as Undeliverable re Notice to Filer,, #1 Application, #2 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter. Per staff at WCC, plaintiff transferred to WSP-Walla Walla. Docket updated; notice regenerated for 1, 2 and Notice to Filer. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)(PS)
January 11, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Application. ***Action Required*** Incorrect IFP Form, Prison Trust Account Statement.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 2/12/2024 to correct IFP application (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)(MW)
January 11, 2024 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Application. RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Washington Corrections Center-Shelton. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)(MW)
January 8, 2024 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Ryan Scott Adams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint)**16 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ryan Adams, Prisoner ID: 415205)(MW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Lanum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Scott Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Lanum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Clarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Donnington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?