Rouse v. Hansen et al
Plaintiff: Rusty Lee Rouse
Defendant: Kevin Hansen, David Guidrey, Randy Newell, Angela Brown, Bree Borden, Jennifer Saucier, Julia Rice, Mason County, Mason County Jail and Summit Foods
Case Number: 3:2024cv05068
Filed: January 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Grady J Leupold
Referring Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Rusty Rouse, Prisoner ID: 394698)(MW)
March 11, 2024 Filing 8 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Bree Borden, David Guidrey, Kevin Hansen, Mason County, Randy Newell, Julia Rice, Summit Foods with JURY DEMAND filed by Rusty Lee Rouse. (attached Motion to Appoint Counsel is a duplicate of dkt #7 ) **18 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Rusty Rouse, Prisoner ID: 394698)(MW)
March 7, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Rusty Lee Rouse. Noted by Clerk for 3/22/2024. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Rusty Rouse, Prisoner ID: 394698)(MW)
March 7, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Bree Borden, Kevin Hansen, Mason County, Randy Newell with JURY DEMAND; filed by Rusty Lee Rouse.**10 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Rusty Rouse, Prisoner ID: 394698)(MW)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Rusty Rouse, Prisoner ID: 394698)(MW) (cc: Plaintiff, DOC, WAWD Finance, WCC via USPS)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE COMPLAINT. The Court declines to serve the Proposed Complaint or to direct that an answer be filed. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend his Complaint and, if possible, to correct the above stated deficiencies, on or before 3/28/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Grady J Leupold. **12 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Rusty Rouse, Prisoner ID: 394698)(MW)
February 16, 2024 NOTICE TO FILER: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Washington Corrections Center-Shelton. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Rusty Rouse, Prisoner ID: 394698)(MW)
February 15, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Grady J. Leupold filed by Rusty Lee Rouse. Noting date 3/28/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Proposed Motion to Appoint Counsel)**25 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Rusty Rouse, Prisoner ID: 394698)(MW) Modified to add noting date on 2/27/2024 (MW).
January 23, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Application,. ***Action Required*** IFP Blank/Incomplete/Unsigned.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 2/22/2024 to correct IFP application (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Rusty Rouse, Prisoner ID: 394698)(MW)
January 23, 2024 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Washington Corrections Center-Shelton. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Rusty Rouse, Prisoner ID: 394698)(MW)
January 22, 2024 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Rusty Lee Rouse. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Trust Account Statement, #3 Proposed Motion to Appoint Counsel, #4 Envelope)**24 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Rusty Rouse, Prisoner ID: 394698)(MW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rouse v. Hansen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rusty Lee Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Guidrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bree Borden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Saucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Foods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?