Spencer v. PeaceHealth
Plaintiff: Kathleen Spencer
Defendant: PeaceHealth
Case Number: 3:2024cv05138
Filed: February 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2024 Upon the request of the parties, the following deadlines are extended: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/13/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/27/2024, Joint Status Report due by 6/3/2024. (TF)
April 12, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Oral Argument Hearing on Defendant's #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2024 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Michelle L. Peterson on Zoom. The clerk will send Zoom invite. (TF)
March 29, 2024 Filing 13 REPLY, filed by Defendant PeaceHealth, TO RESPONSE to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Tellam, Matthew)
March 25, 2024 Filing 12 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Kathleen Spencer, to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Wagner, Joseph)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew A Tellam for DEFENDANT PeaceHealth, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
March 21, 2024 Upon the request of the parties, the following deadlines are extended: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is now 4/22/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/6/2024, Joint Status Report due by 5/13/2024. (TF)
March 20, 2024 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew A. Tellam FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant PeaceHealth (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8397600 (Hanchett, Todd)
March 15, 2024 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Kathleen Spencer with JURY DEMAND filed by Kathleen Spencer.(Wagner, Joseph)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 4/11/2024, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 3/21/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/4/2024, by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TF)
February 29, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (TF)
February 27, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , filed by Defendant PeaceHealth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/29/2024, (Hanchett, Todd)
February 27, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent PeaceHealth Networks for PeaceHealth. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by PeaceHealth. (Hanchett, Todd)
February 27, 2024 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant PeaceHealth (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hanchett, Todd)
February 22, 2024 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2/29/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(CDA)
February 21, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 2/28/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
February 21, 2024 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Clark County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted state court jury demand on file (MW)
February 21, 2024 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (MW)
February 20, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court JURY DEMAND by Plaintiff indicated in Complaint; from Clark County District Court, case number 24C0666-6; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8358086) filed by PeaceHealth. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanchett, Todd) (Attachment 2 replaced due to malformed pdf on 2/21/2024) (MW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. PeaceHealth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Spencer
Represented By: Joseph Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PeaceHealth
Represented By: Todd A Hanchett
Represented By: Matthew A Tellam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?