Perry v. Prestige Care Inc
Plaintiff: Kimberly Perry
Defendant: Prestige Care, Inc. and Prestige Care Inc
Interested Party: Donna Brim
Case Number: 3:2024cv05151
Filed: February 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Referring Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to Consolidate. The Court hereby consolidates Brim v. Prestige Care Inc, No. 3:24-cv-05133-BHS, Perry v. Prestige Care Inc, No. 3:24-cv-05151-BHS, and Turner v. Prestige Care Inc, No. 3:24-cv-05203-BHS into the lowest docketed case Brim v. Prestige Care Inc, No. 3:24-cv-05133-BHS. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (AMD)
April 1, 2024 CASE REASSIGNED to Judge Benjamin H. Settle for all further proceedings. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour no longer assigned to the case. All future documents filed in this case must bear the cause number 3:24-CV-5151-BHS. (KMP)
March 29, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate ; filed by Interested Party Donna Brim. (Boyd, Kaleigh)
March 29, 2024 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour for all further proceedings. Hon. S. Kate Vaughan no longer assigned to case. (AQ)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 4/19/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/3/2024, Joint Status Report due by 5/10/2024. (AQ) Modified on 3/29/2024 - Docket entry stricken and deadlines termed. Declination received by the Court on 3/29/2024. (AQ).
March 29, 2024 Filing 15 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (AQ) Modified on 3/29/2024 - Docket entry stricken. Declination received by the Court on 3/29/2024. (AQ).
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED #13 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan.(TF)
March 21, 2024 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant Prestige Care Inc. Noting Date 3/21/2024, (Larson, Nicholas)
March 21, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 3/28/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (SNP)
March 20, 2024 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by parties (Larson, Nicholas)
March 20, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nicholas C Larson on behalf of Defendant Prestige Care Inc. (Larson, Nicholas)
March 13, 2024 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Prestige Care, Inc. on 2/28/2024, filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Perry. (Subit, Michael)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gary E Mason for Plaintiff Kimberly Perry, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Danielle L Perry for Plaintiff Kimberly Perry, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lisa A White for Plaintiff Kimberly Perry, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 26, 2024 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lisa A. White FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8365627 (Subit, Michael)
February 26, 2024 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Danielle L. Perry FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8365601 (Subit, Michael)
February 26, 2024 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gary E. Mason FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for All Plaintiffs (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8365550 (Subit, Michael)
February 26, 2024 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Prestige Care Inc. (TE)
February 26, 2024 Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (TE)
February 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-8362522) filed by Kimberly Perry. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Subit, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Prestige Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Perry
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Represented By: Gary E Mason
Represented By: Lisa A White
Represented By: Danielle L Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Care Inc
Represented By: Nicholas C Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Donna Brim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?