SanDisk Corp. v. Phison Electronics Corp. et al
Plaintiff: SanDisk Corp.
Defendant: Phison Electronics Corp., Silicon Motion Technology Corp., Silicon Motion, Inc. (Taiwan), Silicon Motion, Inc. (California), Silicon Motion International, Inc., Synergistic Sales, Inc., USBest Technology, Inc., Skymedi Corp., Zotek Electronic Co., Ltd., Zodata Technology Ltd., Infotech Logistic LLC, Power Quotient International Co., Ltd., PQI Corp., PNY Technologies, Inc., Kingston Technology Co., Inc., Kingston Technology Corp., Payton Technology Corp., MemoSun, Inc., Buffalo, Inc., Melco Holdings, Inc., Buffalo Technology (USA) Inc., Verbatim Corp., Transcend Information Inc. (Taiwan), Transcend Information Inc. (California, U.S.A.), Transcend Information Maryland, Inc., A-Data Technology Co., Ltd., A-Data Technology (USA) Co., Ltd., Apacer Technology Inc., Apacer Memory America, Inc., Acer, Inc., Behavior Tech Computer Corp., Behavior Tech Computer USA Corp., Dane-Elec Memory, S.A. and Dane-Elec Corp. USA
Case Number: 3:2007cv00605
Filed: October 24, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 AMENDED JUDGMENT entered in favor of plaintiff SanDisk Corp. granting motion for summary judgment re Kingston Technology Co., Inc. and Kingston Technology Corp.'s defense of lack of standing. AMENDED JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants King ston Technology Co., Inc. and Kingston Technology Corp. granting motion for summary judgment re plaintiff's claims that defendants' products infringed asserted claims of the '842, '316 and '424 patents and re plaintiff's request to pre-filing damages; and dismissing complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction as to defendants Behavior Tech Computer Corp., Behavior Tech Computer USA Corp., Dane-Elec Memory, S.A., LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., ITE Technologies, Inc., Power Quotient International Co., Ltd. and PQI Corp. (BBC / PAO). (Associated Cases: 3:07-cv-00605-bbc, 3:07-cv-00607-bbc) (krj)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff SanDisk Corp. granting motion for summary judgment re Kingston Technology Co., Inc. and Kingston Technology Corp.'s defenses of lack of standing and re plaintiff's claim that defendants contributorily infringed claims 20, 24, 28 and 30 of the '424 patent; JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants Kingston Technology Co., Inc. and Kingston Technology Corp. granting motion for summary judgment re plaintiff's claims that defendants' pro ducts infringed asserted claims of the '842 and '316 patents and claims 1, 3, 4, 8, 9 and 10 of the '424 patent and re plaintiff's claims that defendants' products containing controllers other than the Phison PS3006 infringed claims 20, 24, 28 and 30 of the '424 patent and re plaintiff's request for post-filing damages; and dismissing complaint as to defendants Behavior Tech Computer Corp., Behavior Tech Computer USA Corp., Dane-Elec Memory, S.A., LG Electronics, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., ITE Technologies, Inc., Power Quotient International Co., Ltd. and PQI Corp. (BBC / PAO). (Associated Cases: 3:07-cv-00605-bbc, 3:07-cv-00607-bbc) (krj)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 ORDER granting 1064 in case no. 07-cv-605 and 1042 in case no. 07-cv-607 motion for clarification; 2/15/11 court order amended to state that defendants motion for summary judgment is granted with respect to plaintiffs claim that products containing Skymedi controllers infringe claims 20, 24, 28 and 30 of United States Patent No. 6,763,424 under the doctrine of equivalents. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/17/11. (Associated Cases: 3:07-cv-00605-bbc, 3:07-cv-00607-bbc). (krj)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 928 ORDER Distributing Preliminary Pretrial Conference Packet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 1/26/2011. Associated Cases: 07-cv-607-bbc, 07-cv-605-bbc. (arw)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER Construing Claims. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/22/2010. Associated Cases: 3:07-cv-607-bbc, 3:07-cv-605-bbc. (arw)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (535 in 3:07-cv-605-bbc, 513 in 3:07-cv-607-bbc) Motion Requesting Claims Construction and Hearing by Defendants Kingston Technology Co., Inc., Kingston Technology Corp., Imation Corp., Imation Enterprises Corp., Memorex Products, Inc. Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/23/2010 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Barbara B. Crabb. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/28/2010. Associated Cases: 3:07-cv-605-bbc, 3:07-cv-607-bbc. (arw)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER denying as moot (301) Motion to Dismiss ; denying as moot (318) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot (360) Motion to Dismiss ; denying (475) Motion to Amend Complaint; granting (182) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdic tion in case 3:07-cv-00605-bbc; denying as moot (277) Motion to Dismiss ; denying as moot (295) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot (337) Motion to Dismiss ; denying (453) Motion to Amend Complaint in case 3:07-cv-00607-bbc. Party ITE Technologies, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/2/10. Associated Cases: 3:07-cv-00605-bbc, 3:07-cv-00607-bbc (krj)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER granting (472 in 3:07-cv-00607-bbc, 493 in 3:07-cv-00605-bbc) Motion for Transfer of the ITC Record to the District Court in case 3:07-cv-00605-bbc and 3:07-cv-00607-bbc. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/11/2010. Associated Cases: 3:07-cv-00605-bbc, 3:07-cv-00607-bbc (llj)
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER granting (322) Motion to Dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; granting (347) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting (400) Motion to Dismiss for lack of jurisdicton; granting (154) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting (187) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, all in case 3:07-cv-00605-bbc; granting (299) Motion to Dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; granting (326) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting (378) Motion to Dismiss ; granting (178) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, all in case 3:07-cv-00607-bbc. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/31/09. Associated Cases: 3:07-cv-00605-bbc, 3:07-cv-00607-bbc (krj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SanDisk Corp. v. Phison Electronics Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SanDisk Corp.
Represented By: James R. Troupis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phison Electronics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silicon Motion Technology Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silicon Motion, Inc. (Taiwan)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silicon Motion, Inc. (California)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silicon Motion International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergistic Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USBest Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skymedi Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zotek Electronic Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zodata Technology Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infotech Logistic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Quotient International Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PQI Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNY Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingston Technology Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingston Technology Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payton Technology Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MemoSun, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melco Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Technology (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verbatim Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcend Information Inc. (Taiwan)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcend Information Inc. (California, U.S.A.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transcend Information Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-Data Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-Data Technology (USA) Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apacer Technology Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apacer Memory America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Behavior Tech Computer Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Behavior Tech Computer USA Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane-Elec Memory, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane-Elec Corp. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?