Citgo Petroleum Corporation v. Ranger Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Citgo Petroleum Corporation
Defendant: Ranger Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00657
Filed: November 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Presiding Judge: John C Shabaz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 213 JUDGMENT in the amount of $4,898,214.13 in favor of Plaintiff Citgo Petroleum Corporation against Defendant Ranger Enterprises, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/15/2009. (BBC) (arw)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER denying 174 MOTION for Leave to Preserve Record on Appeal by Alleging Additional Counterclaim, by Defendant Ranger Enterprises, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/17/2009. (arw)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER denying 172 MOTION to Quash by Plaintiff Citgo Petroleum Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/10/2009. (arw)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 95 MOTION for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 130 MOTION for Sanctions Relating to Errata Testimony of Ranger Enterprises; granting 144 MOTION to Strike Supplemental Ex pert Report of Jeffrey Bernard; granting 165 MOTION to Strike Expert Report of Dileep Sirur; granting 166 MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record; denying 173 MOTION for Leave to Allege an Additional Affirmative Defense. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/9/2009. (arw)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying 61 Motion for certification of Interlocutory Appeal of the 11/26/08 court order; granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion to Strike second amended counterclaim ; denying 63 Motion to Dismiss second amended counterclaim - Def endant is to submit a revised version of the second amended counterclaim by 3/13/09 ; denying 65 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) ; denying 87 Motion for Leave to File first amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B Crabb on 3/9/09. (elc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citgo Petroleum Corporation v. Ranger Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citgo Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Shane Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranger Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?