Ruppert, Lawrence G. v. Alliant Energy Cash Balance Pension Fund
Plaintiff: Lawrence G Ruppert
Defendant: Alliant Energy Cash Balance Pension Fund
Case Number: 3:2008cv00127
Filed: February 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER granting 662 Unopposed Motion to Deem Judgment Satisfied. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/16/14. (rep)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 654 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 645 Motion to Appoint Subclass A Representative and Modify Subclass A Definition. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/9/2013. (arw)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 577 AMENDED JUDGMENT declaring that defendant Alliant Energy Cash Balance Pension Plan violated 29 U.S.C. § 1054(c)(3) by underpaying the lump sum retirement benefits of plaintiffs Lawrence G. Ruppert and Thomas A. Larson and all members of the cert ified subclasses identified in the July 2, 2012 order of this court. Plaintiffs are awarded $7,890,569.75 in additional plan benefits and $10,787,101.58 in prejudgment interest, to be distributed to class members as set forth in the corrected Attachment A to this amended judgment. (BBC/PAO) (arw)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 572 JUDGMENT declaring that defendant Alliant Energy Cash Balance Pension Plan violated 29 U.S.C. § 1054(c)(3) by underpaying the lump sum retirement benefits of plaintiffs Lawrence G. Ruppert and Thomas A. Larson and all members of the certified subclasses identified in the July 2, 2012 order of this court. Plaintiffs are awarded $7,890,569.75 in additional plan benefits and $10,787,101.58 in prejudgment interest. (BBC/PAO) (arw)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER declaring that defendant Alliant Energy Cash Balance Pension Fund violated 29 U.S.C. § 1054(c)(3) by underpaying the lump sum retirement benefits of plaintiffs and all members of the certified subclasses identified in the court's July 2, 2012 order. Plaintiffs are awarded $7,890,569.75 in additional plan benefits and $10,787,101.58 in prejudgment interest. Plaintiffs' proposed class notice is approved with changes. Plaintiffs have until 8/31/2012 to file and serve their motion to compel. Defendant has until 9/7/2012 to respond. Plaintiffs have until 9/10/2012 to file their fee petition and send notice to class members. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/24/2012. (arw)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER granting defendant leave to submit the Declaration of Gregory Lyster, directing defendant to provide plaintiffs with proposed new trial exhibits by 10/7/2011 and file them with the court by 10/14/2011; DENYING plaintiffs' motion to order d efendant to conduct a more thorough review for overlooked class members; DENYING without prejudice plaintiffs' motion to require defendant to provide an updated class certification notice to all overlooked class members. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/22/2011. (arw)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER amending cover letter sent to class members explaining payments pursuant to IRS determination letter. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/3/2011. (arw)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER Regarding Notice to Class Members of IRS Determination Letter Additional Benefits. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/2/2011. (arw)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER on 3/14/2011 telephone hearing, setting schedule for submissions re: calculation issues identified by the court. Hearing set in person for 5/23/2011, 8:30 AM. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/18/2011. (llj)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER setting briefing deadlines regarding Calculation of Damages. Defendant is to collect and certify any remaining data necessary for calculation by 1/28/2011. On the issues of compounding prejudgment interest and the amounts due class members for years in which they took their lump sum distribution, defendant's brief is due 1/28/2011, plaintiff's brief is due 2/11/2011, defendant's reply is due 2/18/2011. One side's actuary is to perform calculations, and the other side's actuary to review, not later than 3/18/2011. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 1/14/2011. (arw)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER that in determining the lump sum benefits of plaintiffs and other members of the plaintiff class, defendant is to apply an interest crediting rate of 8.2% and no pre-retirement mortality discount. The parties are to confer promptly on the calculation of damages due each plaintiff and advise the court no later than January 7, 2011. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 12/29/2010. (arw)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER setting briefing deadlines re: applicability of pre-mortality discount in calculating lump sum benefits. Defendant may have until 11/19/2010 to file its brief. Plaintiffs may have until 11/29/2010 to respond. Defendant may have until 12/6/2010 to reply. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 11/8/2010. (arw)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER denying 334 Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiffs Thomas A. Larson and Lawrence G. Ruppert. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/22/2010. (arw)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER granting 320 Motion in Limine ; granting 321 Motion in Limine ; granting 322 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 328 Motion to Strike deposition designations. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/18/10. (krj)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER denying 119 Motion to Compel Disclosure of Allegedly Privileged Documents; denying 282 Motion to Compel; denying 302 Motion to Compel Compliance with May 14, 2010 Deposition Subpoenas; denying 304 Motion to Compel Compliance with April 30, 2010 Subpoenas Duces Tecum; denying 306 Emergency Motion for Hearing; denying as moot 150 Motion to Strike; granting 292 Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoenas Duces Tecum; granting 300 Motion for Protective Order, granting 296 Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena Duces Tecum; granting 298 Motion to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoenas for Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/3/2010. (arw)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER approving with changes 96 Proposed Class Notice. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/2/2009. (arw)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying 85 MOTION to Strike by Plaintiffs Thomas A. Larson, Lawrence G. Ruppert. Plaintiffs have until 5/15/2009 to provide defendant with latest version of proposed notice to class members. Defendant has until 5/18/2009 to provide plaintiff with its objections. By 5/20/2009, the parties must file their joint agreed notice, or plaintiff must file and serve its proposed notice and defendant must file its objections. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/13/2009. (arw)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER re: Notice to Certified Class. Plaintiffs have until 4/24/2009 to submit proposed notice to defendants. Joint agreed notice due 5/1/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 4/15/2009. (arw)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 37 Motion to Certify Class; Two subclasses are certified. Eli Gottesdiener is appointed as class counsel for both subclasses. Plaintiffs may have until February 25, 2009 in which to present their position regarding whether notice is proper in this case; defendant has until March 6, 2009 to submit a brief in response; and plaintiffs have until March 13, 2009 to submit a brief in reply. Motion 54 for leave to file a response to plaintiffs supplement to motion to compel is denied. Motion 56 for leave to file a second amended answer is granted. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B Crabb on 2/12/09. (elc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruppert, Lawrence G. v. Alliant Energy Cash Balance Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence G Ruppert
Represented By: Eli Gottesdiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliant Energy Cash Balance Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?