MARSHALL v. HOLM
Plaintiff: MARK D. MARSHALL
Defendant: WILLIAM HOLM
Case Number: 3:2008cv00398
Filed: July 22, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dodge
Presiding Judge: Barbara B Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 JUDGMENT entered dismissing the case. against defendant with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). (PAO / MFH). (elc),(ps)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER directing plaintiff to show cause by 6/15/09 why this case should not be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/5/09. (elc),(ps) Modified on 6/5/2009: Copy of order mailed to Kansas St. address as well. (eds)
July 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on IFP request: Petitioner to submit Trust Fund Account Statement. Trust Fund Account Statement due by 8/8/2008. Signed by Judge Barbara B Crabb on 7/18/08. (elc),(ps)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARSHALL v. HOLM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK D. MARSHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM HOLM
Represented By: Corey F. Finkelmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?