Goodell v. CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marc Goodell
Defendant: CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC and CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00512
Filed: August 28, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
County: Dane
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Presiding Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 AMENDED JUDGMENT entered per stipulation of the parties. Authorized Claimants to receive $5,108,000.76 (instead of $5,102,499.52). (BBC / PAO) Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/29/2010. (llj)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Authorized Claimants ($5,102,499.52), class counsel ($5,4000,000.00) and individual plaintiffs (total amount $75,000.00). (BBC / PAO). Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/24/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - pages 1-14, # 2 Exhibit A - pages 15 - 27) (llj)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting 84 Motion for Class Counsel's Costs and Attorneys' Fees. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 8/17/2010. (vob)
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 70 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Provisional Class Certification, and Approval of Class Notice and Claim, Opt-In, Waiver and Release Form. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 5/20/2010. (vob)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER vacating 55 Order of dismissal entered February 23, 2009; case stayed and closed administratively. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 3/31/09. (vob) Modified text on 4/10/2009 (llj).
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B Crabb on 2/23/2009. (arw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodell v. CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Goodell
Represented By: Michael J. Modl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?