Markel American Insurance Company v. Bachmann

Plaintiff: Markel American Insurance Company
Defendant: Fred Bachmann
Case Number: 3:2009cv00226
Filed: April 15, 2009
Court: Wisconsin Western District Court
Office: Contract: Marine Office
County: Waukesha
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Barbara B. Crabb
Referring Judge: Stephen L. Crocker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order 202 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff Markel American Insurance Company dismissing the case. Signed by Clerk of Court Peter Oppeneer on 10/1/10. (krj)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order 201 ORDER that plaintiff is not required to pay defendant for damage to boat under Policy No. RP2006972. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/24/10. (krj)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 151 ORDER denying 133 Motion for Reconsideration of 132 6/2/10 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/12/10. (krj)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order 132 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's motion to dismiss third-party defendant's cross-claim against plaintiff granted. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/2/10. (krj)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order 84 ORDER denying 72 Motion to Dismiss third-party defendant Murphy Services, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 2/25/10. (krj)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order 54 ORDER denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 3 Motion to Stay pending arbitration; scheduling conference to be set. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 9/17/09. (krj)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order 23 ORDER that defendant has until 7/8/09 to file summary judgment motion; plaintiff's response due 7/29/09; defendant's reply due 8/9/09. Signed by Chief Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 6/24/09. (krj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Markel American Insurance Company v. Bachmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markel American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jean-Marie Feedham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Bachmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?